Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-06-25 17:28 Tx date 2024-06-25 |
$MDA
MDA Space Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+4,180 vol |
34,617 | |
Filed 2024-04-02 10:09 Tx date 2024-03-31 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,436 vol |
30,437 | |
Filed 2024-01-03 14:06 Tx date 2023-12-31 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,289 vol |
27,001 | |
Filed 2023-10-02 12:22 Tx date 2023-09-30 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,291 vol |
23,712 | |
Filed 2023-07-04 16:26 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+4,632 vol |
20,421 | |
Filed 2023-04-03 17:49 Tx date 2023-03-31 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+5,382 vol |
15,789 | |
Filed 2023-01-04 09:12 Tx date 2022-12-31 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+4,771 vol |
10,407 | |
Filed 2022-10-03 10:52 Tx date 2022-09-30 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,769 vol |
5,636 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 17:30 Tx date 2022-06-30 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,867 vol |
1,867 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 17:29 Tx date 2022-05-11 |
$MDA
MDA Ltd. |
Alfers, Jaye Alison
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|