Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-12-20 09:46 Tx date 2023-12-20 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
1,500,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-19 19:16 Tx date 2019-12-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-12-19 18:33 Tx date 2019-12-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
1,325,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-19 18:33 Tx date 2019-12-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-11-13 09:38 Tx date 2023-11-13 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-66,000
-300,000 vol $0.22 each |
1,200,000 | |
Filed 2023-09-06 14:48 Tx date 2023-09-06 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,125
+25,000 vol $0.045 each |
334,107 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:07 Tx date 2023-08-18 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$540.00
+12,000 vol $0.045 each |
309,107 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:06 Tx date 2023-08-16 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$135.00
+3,000 vol $0.045 each |
297,107 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:05 Tx date 2023-08-15 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$270.00
+6,000 vol $0.045 each |
294,107 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:04 Tx date 2023-08-15 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$135.00
+3,000 vol $0.045 each |
288,107 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:04 Tx date 2023-08-14 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$45.00
+1,000 vol $0.045 each |
285,107 | |
Filed 2023-01-11 14:09 Tx date 2023-01-11 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,750
+50,000 vol $0.055 each |
271,000 | |
Filed 2023-01-11 11:18 Tx date 2023-01-11 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,375
+25,000 vol $0.055 each |
284,107 | |
Filed 2022-12-16 21:29 Tx date 2022-12-15 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$21,000
+300,000 vol $0.07 each |
1,500,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-16 21:06 Tx date 2022-12-16 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$21,000
+300,000 vol $0.07 each |
||
Filed 2022-11-28 11:30 Tx date 2022-11-28 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-60,000
-200,000 vol $0.30 each |
1,200,000 | |
Filed 2022-09-08 10:14 Tx date 2022-09-08 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$550.00
+10,000 vol $0.055 each |
259,107 | |
Filed 2022-09-07 11:06 Tx date 2022-09-07 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$550.00
+10,000 vol $0.055 each |
249,107 | |
Filed 2022-07-16 10:50 Tx date 2022-07-14 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$55.00
+1,000 vol $0.055 each |
239,107 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 16:38 Tx date 2022-07-11 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,100
-20,000 vol $0.055 each |
238,107 | |
Filed 2021-12-26 18:41 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
1,400,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-22 14:54 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
||
Filed 2021-12-22 14:54 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
1,400,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-07 13:56 Tx date 2021-12-07 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,000
+100,000 vol $0.06 each |
221,000 | |
Filed 2021-11-29 10:59 Tx date 2021-11-27 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-175,000 vol |
1,150,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-09 23:33 Tx date 2020-12-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
1,325,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-21 16:39 Tx date 2020-10-21 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,110
+36,500 vol $0.14 each |
91,642 | |
Filed 2020-10-21 16:38 Tx date 2020-10-21 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,249
+50,000 vol $0.145 each |
55,142 | |
Filed 2020-01-08 16:35 Tx date 2020-01-08 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$624.00
+3,900 vol $0.16 each |
157,400 | |
Filed 2019-12-21 10:55 Tx date 2019-12-20 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,701
+31,343 vol $0.15 each |
121,200 | |
Filed 2019-12-10 14:49 Tx date 2019-12-10 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+56,500 vol |
62,000 | |
Filed 2019-12-10 14:47 Tx date 2019-12-10 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-56,500 vol |
100,446 | |
Filed 2019-12-10 14:46 Tx date 2019-12-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+56,500 vol |
156,946 | |
Filed 2019-12-10 13:54 Tx date 2019-12-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-56,500 vol |
258,107 | |
Filed 2019-12-02 10:07 Tx date 2019-11-29 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+58,500 vol |
153,500 | |
Filed 2019-12-02 10:05 Tx date 2019-11-29 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-58,500 vol |
314,607 | |
Filed 2019-11-22 09:26 Tx date 2019-11-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+350,000 vol |
1,025,000 | |
Filed 2019-11-22 09:21 Tx date 2019-11-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-40,000 vol |
675,000 | |
Filed 2019-11-22 09:18 Tx date 2019-11-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$4,800
+40,000 vol $0.12 each |
373,107 | |
Filed 2019-11-22 09:16 Tx date 2019-11-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$7,500
+75,000 vol $0.10 each |
333,107 | |
Filed 2019-11-22 09:14 Tx date 2019-11-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-75,000 vol |
715,000 | |
Filed 2018-12-11 Tx date 2018-12-11 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-32,000
-200,000 vol $0.16 each |
790,000 | |
Filed 2018-11-16 Tx date 2018-11-14 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$66,000
+300,000 vol $0.22 each |
||
Filed 2018-11-16 Tx date 2018-11-14 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$66,000
+300,000 vol $0.22 each |
990,000 | |
Filed 2018-11-15 Tx date 2018-11-14 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$66,000
+300,000 vol $0.22 each |
990,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-09 Tx date 2018-03-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+100,000 vol |
100,446 | |
Filed 2018-03-09 Tx date 2018-03-08 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-9,315
-34,500 vol $0.27 each |
446 | |
Filed 2018-03-09 Tx date 2018-03-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-100,000 vol |
258,107 | |
Filed 2018-03-05 Tx date 2018-03-01 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,025
-7,500 vol $0.27 each |
34,946 | |
Filed 2018-03-01 Tx date 2018-02-26 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-14,500
-50,000 vol $0.29 each |
42,446 | |
Filed 2018-01-22 Tx date 2018-01-17 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$54,000
+225,000 vol $0.24 each |
358,107 | |
Filed 2018-01-22 Tx date 2018-01-17 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$-54,000
-225,000 vol $0.24 each |
690,000 | |
Filed 2017-12-20 Tx date 2017-12-20 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,150
-10,000 vol $0.315 each |
133,107 | |
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-04 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Reer Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Les Entreprises Luc Cloutier Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Feer Luc Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2017-11-28 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-01 Tx date 2011-12-08 |
$KAS
Khalkos Exploration Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-11-28 Tx date 2017-11-27 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$60,000
+200,000 vol $0.30 each |
915,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-31 Tx date 2017-08-31 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$5,475
+15,000 vol $0.365 each |
95,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-31 Tx date 2017-08-31 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$-5,475
-15,000 vol $0.365 each |
143,107 | |
Filed 2017-06-19 Tx date 2017-06-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-28,571 vol |
715,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-01 Tx date 2016-11-29 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$87,500
+175,000 vol $0.50 each |
743,571 | |
Filed 2016-12-01 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$87,500
+175,000 vol $0.50 each |
||
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$87,500
+175,000 vol $0.50 each |
743,571 | |
Filed 2016-10-26 Tx date 2016-10-26 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Milène Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-16,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-10-26 Tx date 2016-10-26 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+80,000 vol |
80,000 | |
Filed 2016-10-26 Tx date 2003-09-07 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-10-26 Tx date 2016-10-26 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-80,000 vol |
158,107 | |
Filed 2016-10-17 Tx date 2016-10-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$20,000
+200,000 vol $0.10 each |
238,107 | |
Filed 2016-10-17 Tx date 2015-10-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$20,000
+200,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2016-10-14 Tx date 2016-10-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
-200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2016-10-14 Tx date 2015-10-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$20,000
+200,000 vol $0.10 each |
238,107 | |
Filed 2016-10-14 Tx date 2016-10-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-200,000 vol |
568,571 | |
Filed 2016-09-20 Tx date 2016-09-19 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Milène Cloutier (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$11,040
+11,500 vol $0.96 each |
16,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-18 Tx date 2016-09-16 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Milène Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,870
+4,500 vol $0.86 each |
4,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-13 Tx date 2016-09-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$470.00
+500 vol $0.94 each |
5,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-13 Tx date 2016-09-09 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,650
+5,000 vol $0.93 each |
5,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-13 Tx date 2003-09-07 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Carmen Cloutier (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-13 Tx date 2003-09-07 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Celi Milène Cloutier (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-12 Tx date 2016-05-12 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-21,429 vol |
768,571 | |
Filed 2015-12-13 Tx date 2015-12-10 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-12-13 Tx date 2015-12-08 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
790,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-11 Tx date 2015-12-10 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
790,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-01 Tx date 2012-06-18 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
720,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-01 Tx date 2012-06-18 |
$SOI
Sirios Resources Inc. |
Cloutier, Luc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |