Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-169,147 vol |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$27,000
+75,000 vol $0.36 each |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-27,000
-75,000 vol $0.36 each |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$-27,000
-75,000 vol $0.36 each |
0 | |
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-27,000
-75,000 vol $0.36 each |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$27,000
+75,000 vol $0.36 each |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-169,147 vol |
||
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$27,000
+75,000 vol $0.36 each |
169,147 | |
Filed 2017-12-12 Tx date 2017-12-12 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-169,147 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-01-17 Tx date 2016-11-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-17 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-11-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+$55,147 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+$55,147 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+55,147 vol |
94,147 | |
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2016-12-29 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+$55,147 vol |
$55,147 | |
Filed 2016-12-29 Tx date 2016-12-29 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures 2011
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$15,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2016-09-08 Tx date 2016-06-27 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-225,000 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-08 Tx date 2016-06-27 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-117,000 vol |
39,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-07 Tx date 2016-04-06 |
$EIL
Empire Industries Ltd. |
Lin, Chao Jian (Jane)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$540.00
+6,000 vol $0.09 each |
156,000 |