Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-05-16 10:38 Tx date 2021-03-08 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+3,000,000 vol |
||
Filed 2021-03-11 08:56 Tx date 2021-03-08 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+3,000,000 vol |
||
Filed 2021-10-01 12:06 Tx date 2003-05-12 |
$BIE
BioEnvelop Technologies Corporation |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2003-06-20 14:41 Tx date 2003-05-12 |
$BIE
BioEnvelop Technologies Corporation |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-09-02 08:56 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-09-02 08:55 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-09-02 08:54 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-12-04 17:30 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-01-14 13:38 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-01-14 13:38 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-30 09:22 Tx date 2019-11-21 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,000
+12,500 vol $0.08 each |
||
Filed 2019-12-04 17:37 Tx date 2019-11-21 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,000
+12,500 vol $0.08 each |
||
Filed 2021-03-11 08:56 Tx date 2021-03-08 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+3,000,000 vol |
4,250,000 | |
Filed 2020-03-10 16:38 Tx date 2020-03-07 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$62,500
+1,250,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,250,000 | |
Filed 2020-03-10 16:34 Tx date 2019-03-30 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-01-02 11:17 Tx date 2019-03-30 |
$CHV
Canada House Wellness Group Inc. (formerly Abba Medix Group Inc.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
100,000 | ||
Filed 2019-12-04 17:37 Tx date 2019-11-21 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,000
+12,500 vol $0.08 each |
130,147 | |
Filed 2019-12-04 17:30 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
117,647 | ||
Filed 2019-01-14 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
117,647 | ||
Filed 2019-01-14 Tx date 2019-01-04 |
$SAFE
3 Sixty Risk Solutions Ltd. (formerly, Petro Vista Energy Corp.) |
Lussier, Gaétan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gaetan Lussier and Associates (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 |