Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-11-01 17:28 Tx date 2022-10-28 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+5,000 vol |
55,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:28 Tx date 2022-07-15 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+5,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:27 Tx date 2022-10-28 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-5,000 vol |
10,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:25 Tx date 2022-07-15 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-5,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:24 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-180,000 vol |
45,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:22 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-80,000 vol |
20,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:09 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:08 Tx date 2021-10-13 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:07 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-25,000 vol |
125,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-01 17:06 Tx date 2021-10-13 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-25,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 15:27 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:25 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-140,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:27 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 15:26 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-800,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 15:25 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-140,000 vol |
35,000 | |
Filed 2022-07-11 15:24 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-120,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:24 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-800,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:24 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-140,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:23 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-120,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:22 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-800,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-07-11 15:21 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-140,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-03-07 11:33 Tx date 2022-03-01 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
175,000 | |
Filed 2022-03-07 11:33 Tx date 2022-03-01 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-25,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-21 13:17 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$127,899
+50,000 vol $2.56 each |
150,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-10 13:14 Tx date 2021-12-10 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$91,750
+25,000 vol $3.67 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 11:00 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 10:59 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-25,000 vol |
175,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-26 15:24 Tx date 2021-02-23 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-26 15:23 Tx date 2020-01-20 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-26 15:22 Tx date 2021-02-23 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-26 15:20 Tx date 2020-01-20 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-04 12:55 Tx date 2021-02-04 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$140,000
+50,000 vol $2.80 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2020-03-19 13:33 Tx date 2020-03-19 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-636,800
-4,000,000 vol $0.1592 each |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-22 16:45 Tx date 2020-01-22 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$250,400
+2,000,000 vol $0.1252 each |
4,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-22 13:23 Tx date 2020-01-20 |
$HIVE
HIVE Blockchain Technologies Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,000,000 | ||
Filed 2018-01-18 Tx date 2018-01-10 |
$SQR
Squire Mining Ltd. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-54,435
-2,850,000 vol $0.0191 each |
1,425,001 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-05-31 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
2020 Debentures
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$
-$207,797 vol $1.95 each |
$0 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-05-31 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
2020 Debentures Extended to 2024
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$
+$207,797 vol $1.95 each |
$207,797 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2016-03-14 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
2020 Debentures Extended to 2024
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-05-09 Tx date 2016-03-14 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
2020 Debentures
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
$207,797 | ||
Filed 2017-05-09 Tx date 2017-04-25 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
$-1,904,000.85
-746,667 vol $2.55 each |
86,666 | |
Filed 2017-05-09 Tx date 2017-04-25 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
$-1,190,000.85
-466,667 vol $2.55 each |
833,333 | |
Filed 2017-05-09 Tx date 2017-04-03 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$136,000
+800,000 vol $0.17 each |
1,300,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2016-03-14 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2016-04-01 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2016-03-24 Tx date 2016-03-14 |
$GCM
Gran Colombia Gold Corp. |
Mann, Ian Hollis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|