Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2021-12-02 19:22 Tx date 2021-02-26 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$180,016
+7,892 vol $22.81 each |
27,204 | |
Filed 2021-03-01 18:53 Tx date 2021-02-26 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$180,016
+7,892 vol $22.81 each |
||
Filed 2021-03-01 18:53 Tx date 2021-02-26 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$180,016
+7,892 vol $22.81 each |
27,204 | |
Filed 2021-02-25 17:24 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,221 vol |
19,312 | |
Filed 2020-03-18 16:09 Tx date 2020-03-18 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$107,500
+50,000 vol $2.15 each |
155,500 | |
Filed 2020-03-10 11:14 Tx date 2020-03-09 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$102,076
+40,000 vol $2.55 each |
105,500 | |
Filed 2020-03-10 11:13 Tx date 2020-03-09 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$101,375
+25,000 vol $4.05 each |
65,500 | |
Filed 2020-03-03 07:59 Tx date 2020-02-28 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$168,758
+13,309 vol $12.68 each |
18,091 | |
Filed 2020-02-27 14:51 Tx date 2020-02-27 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$267,652
+25,000 vol $10.71 each |
40,500 | |
Filed 2020-02-24 15:57 Tx date 2020-02-21 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$245,985
+15,500 vol $15.87 each |
15,500 | |
Filed 2020-02-24 15:56 Tx date 2020-01-24 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ricks Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-02-03 16:59 Tx date 2020-01-24 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,782 | ||
Filed 2020-02-03 16:59 Tx date 2020-01-24 |
$OVV
Ovintiv Inc. |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
51,731 | ||
Filed 2019-11-01 13:28 Tx date 2019-11-01 |
$ECA
Encana Corporation |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$247,493
+62,500 vol $3.96 each |
258,657 | |
Filed 2019-03-11 Tx date 2019-03-08 |
$ECA
Encana Corporation |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$168,754
+23,569 vol $7.16 each |
23,569 | |
Filed 2019-03-11 Tx date 2019-02-13 |
$ECA
Encana Corporation |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Director Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-22 Tx date 2019-02-13 |
$ECA
Encana Corporation |
Ricks, Thomas Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
196,157 |