Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$GRA
NanoXplore Inc. (formerly Graniz Mondal Inc.) |
Doyon, Bruno
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$1,127,274
+587,122 vol $1.92 each |
587,122 | |
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$-879,162
-1,172,216 vol $0.75 each |
0 | |
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$
-$242,000 vol $0.55 each |
$0 | |
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Fiducie T2GREEN (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$-186,644.25
-248,859 vol $0.75 each |
0 | |
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$GRA
NanoXplore Inc. (formerly Graniz Mondal Inc.) |
Doyon, Bruno
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Fiducie T2GREEN (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$186,641
+97,209 vol $1.92 each |
97,209 | |
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$GRA
NanoXplore Inc. (formerly Graniz Mondal Inc.) |
Doyon, Bruno
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Fiducie T2GREEN (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-10-01 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$GRA
NanoXplore Inc. (formerly Graniz Mondal Inc.) |
Doyon, Bruno
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-30 Tx date 2005-10-07 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Consolidated Composites Industries (CCI) Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Convertible Debentures
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-30 Tx date 2016-09-26 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Consolidated Composites Industries (CCI) Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Convertible Debentures
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+$242,000 vol |
$242,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-17 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-$100,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-11-17 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
97 - Other
|
-$55,000 vol |
$87,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-17 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-$55,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-11-17 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
97 - Other
|
-$100,000 vol |
$142,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-16 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-$100,000 vol |
$142,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-16 Tx date 2015-11-13 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$55,000 vol $0.10 each |
$242,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-16 Tx date 2015-11-13 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$100,000 vol $0.10 each |
$187,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-16 Tx date 2015-11-10 |
$SSG
Sigma Industries Inc. |
Doyon, Bruno
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-$55,000 vol |
$87,000 |