Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-12-08 19:33 Tx date 2023-12-06 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-08 18:48 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2023-07-05 12:14 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-11-04 14:30 Tx date 2023-06-14 |
$DAU
Desert Gold Ventures Inc. |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$42,000
+600,000 vol $0.07 each |
600,000 | |
Filed 2023-11-04 14:27 Tx date 2023-06-14 |
$DAU
Desert Gold Ventures Inc. |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-07-05 12:17 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2023-07-05 12:14 Tx date 2023-06-04 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-07-05 12:14 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2023-07-05 12:12 Tx date 2023-06-04 |
$SASK
Atha Energy Corp. (formerly "Inglenook Ventures Ltd.") |
Engdahl, Douglas Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|