Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-09-07 12:39 Tx date 2023-09-07 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,600
+20,000 vol $0.93 each |
65,514 | |
Filed 2023-09-02 11:47 Tx date 2023-08-31 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,757 vol |
45,514 | |
Filed 2023-09-02 11:46 Tx date 2023-08-31 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,757 vol |
2,757 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:46 Tx date 2023-08-15 |
$HHRS
Hammerhead Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Share Awards
56 - Grant of rights
|
+6,000 vol |
6,000 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 10:45 Tx date 2023-02-24 |
$HHRS
Hammerhead Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Share Awards
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-03-10 09:21 Tx date 2023-02-24 |
$HHRS
Hammerhead Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Legacy Share Awards
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
14,697 | ||
Filed 2023-03-10 09:20 Tx date 2023-02-24 |
$HHRS
Hammerhead Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
7,349 | ||
Filed 2023-01-09 16:32 Tx date 2023-01-09 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+7,337 vol |
96,737 | |
Filed 2022-10-05 19:34 Tx date 2022-10-03 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+9,037 vol |
89,400 | |
Filed 2022-09-19 15:05 Tx date 2022-09-13 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,757 vol |
42,757 | |
Filed 2022-09-19 15:04 Tx date 2022-09-13 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,757 vol |
5,514 | |
Filed 2022-07-06 19:02 Tx date 2022-07-04 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+8,438 vol |
8,438 | |
Filed 2022-07-06 19:01 Tx date 2017-11-03 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-07-06 12:00 Tx date 2022-07-06 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+9,037 vol |
80,363 | |
Filed 2022-07-06 10:15 Tx date 2021-08-31 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+8,271 vol |
8,271 | |
Filed 2021-06-03 12:47 Tx date 2021-05-31 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+8,500 vol |
||
Filed 2022-03-14 18:54 Tx date 2022-03-09 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+10,000 vol |
62,595 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 13:03 Tx date 2022-01-01 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+7,025 vol |
52,595 | |
Filed 2021-10-04 18:01 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+7,025 vol |
45,570 | |
Filed 2021-07-06 17:45 Tx date 2021-07-06 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+7,025 vol |
38,545 | |
Filed 2021-06-03 12:47 Tx date 2021-05-31 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+8,500 vol |
8,500 | |
Filed 2021-06-03 12:46 Tx date 2017-11-03 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-09 11:48 Tx date 2021-04-09 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+7,026 vol |
31,520 | |
Filed 2021-04-06 17:10 Tx date 2021-04-05 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+10,000 vol |
24,494 | |
Filed 2020-12-31 15:35 Tx date 2020-12-30 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-159,441 vol |
14,494 | |
Filed 2020-12-31 14:11 Tx date 2020-12-30 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-183,334 vol |
16,666 | |
Filed 2020-04-24 17:46 Tx date 2020-04-23 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+92,610 vol |
173,935 | |
Filed 2019-11-15 13:56 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$19,500
+100,000 vol $0.195 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-31 17:32 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,450
+5,000 vol $5.09 each |
12,000 | |
Filed 2019-04-18 17:55 Tx date 2019-04-18 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$29,554
+6,100 vol $4.84 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2019-04-18 17:54 Tx date 2019-04-17 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$162,042
+33,900 vol $4.78 each |
33,900 | |
Filed 2019-04-04 17:07 Tx date 2019-04-04 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+60,254 vol |
81,325 | |
Filed 2019-04-04 17:02 Tx date 2019-04-04 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+12,500 vol |
21,071 | |
Filed 2018-11-06 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-11-06 Tx date 2018-11-06 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$191,000
+100,000 vol $1.91 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2018-02-26 Tx date 2017-12-01 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$16,450
+7,000 vol $2.35 each |
7,000 | |
Filed 2017-12-11 Tx date 2017-11-03 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-12-11 Tx date 2017-11-03 |
$QST
Questor Technology Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-05-03 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,571 | ||
Filed 2017-05-03 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-05-02 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
DSU
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-05-02 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
DSU
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-05-02 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,571 | ||
Filed 2017-05-02 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
DSU
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-04-17 Tx date 2017-04-13 |
$SHLE
Source Energy Services Ltd. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
DSU
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,571 | ||
Filed 2017-03-31 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+10,132 vol |
160,533 | |
Filed 2017-03-31 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+413 vol |
221,692 | |
Filed 2017-03-22 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
-63,079 vol |
106,100 | |
Filed 2017-03-22 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+19,558 vol |
240,837 | |
Filed 2017-03-21 Tx date 2011-06-07 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-03-21 Tx date 2017-03-17 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+18,778 vol |
169,179 | |
Filed 2017-03-21 Tx date 2017-03-17 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+60,090 vol |
60,090 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-06-01 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+89,897 vol |
150,401 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-06-02 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+6,500 vol |
221,279 | |
Filed 2016-03-31 Tx date 2015-12-31 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+5,572 vol |
87,393 | |
Filed 2016-03-31 Tx date 2015-12-31 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+2,577 vol |
208,366 | |
Filed 2016-03-18 Tx date 2016-03-15 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
-26,889 vol |
54,932 | |
Filed 2016-03-18 Tx date 2016-03-15 |
$GEI
Gibson Energy Inc. |
Hanlon, Alan Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+6,413 vol |
212,202 |