Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-09-06 14:41 Tx date 2024-04-23 |
$TTG
Trans Canada Gold Corp. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$22,500
+450,000 vol $0.05 each |
790,000 | |
Filed 2021-03-09 12:23 Tx date 2021-03-05 |
$TTG
Trans Canada Gold Corp. (formerly Arctic Hunter Energy Inc.) |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+100,000 vol $0.20 each |
340,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-03 15:31 Tx date 2019-05-03 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
$-15,000
-100,000 vol $0.15 each |
0 | |
Filed 2019-05-03 15:28 Tx date 2019-05-03 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
$15,000
+100,000 vol $0.15 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-03 15:23 Tx date 2019-05-03 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
$-55,000
-100,000 vol $0.55 each |
||
Filed 2018-11-01 Tx date 2018-11-01 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
$-15,000
-37,500 vol $0.40 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-31 Tx date 2016-11-04 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-05-31 Tx date 2018-05-14 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$24,000
+240,000 vol $0.10 each |
240,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-31 Tx date 2017-05-26 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
$10,000
+100,000 vol $0.10 each |
137,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-31 Tx date 2017-05-26 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
$15,000
+100,000 vol $0.15 each |
137,500 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-04 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
37,500 | ||
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-04 |
$AHU
Arctic Hunter Energy Inc. |
Ilich, Lawrence Patrick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
37,500 |