Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-04 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: ESL Partners, L.P. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
-478,251 vol |
25,718,956 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-04 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: ESL Partners, L.P. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
-46,226 vol |
25,672,730 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-04 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: ESL Partners, L.P. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
-2,168,214 vol |
23,504,516 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
+4,744 vol |
22,657,400 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: CRK Partners, L.L.C. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-599 vol |
||
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
+599 vol |
22,657,999 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: CRK Partners, L.L.C. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
-599 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$SCC
Sears Canada Inc. |
Lampert, Edward S.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: ESL Institutional Partners, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
35 - Stock dividend
|
-8,223 vol |
0 |