Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-183,524 vol |
183,524 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2013-08-26 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Asklepios Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-515,647 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2012-12-11 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$24,162
+8,332 vol $2.90 each |
8,332 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,657
+1,311 vol $2.79 each |
9,643 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$465,878
+145,587 vol $3.20 each |
155,230 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+155,230 vol |
310,460 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-155,230 vol |
155,230 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$161,424
+60,233 vol $2.68 each |
215,463 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-346,690.16
-129,362 vol $2.68 each |
||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Blackbird 1846 Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$346,690
+129,362 vol $2.68 each |
344,825 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2012-12-11 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
+82,953 vol |
82,953 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$30,612
+10,556 vol $2.90 each |
93,509 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,589
+1,645 vol $2.79 each |
95,154 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$681,392
+212,935 vol $3.20 each |
308,089 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+308,089 vol |
616,178 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-308,089 vol |
308,089 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Children's Energy Fu (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$238,123
+88,852 vol $2.68 each |
396,941 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$79,454
+27,398 vol $2.90 each |
1,433,373 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$11,907
+4,268 vol $2.79 each |
1,437,641 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$856,227
+267,571 vol $3.20 each |
1,705,212 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,705,212 vol |
3,410,424 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-1,705,212 vol |
1,705,212 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Hephaestus Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$1,750,002
+652,986 vol $2.68 each |
2,358,198 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Luxiver , LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,757,909 vol |
5,515,818 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Luxiver , LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,757,909 vol |
2,757,909 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Luxiver , LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$1,907,227
+711,652 vol $2.68 each |
3,469,561 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2012-12-11 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
+48,152 vol |
48,152 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,770
+3,714 vol $2.90 each |
51,866 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,607
+576 vol $2.79 each |
52,442 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-22 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$419,462
+131,082 vol $3.20 each |
183,524 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+183,524 vol |
367,048 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LVPU, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$129,736
+48,409 vol $2.68 each |
231,933 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Navitas Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,385,000 vol |
4,770,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Navitas Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,385,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Navitas Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,385,000 vol |
2,385,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Urja, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-131,105 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Navitas Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$1,278,360
+477,000 vol $2.68 each |
2,862,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Panakeia Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+595,502 vol |
1,191,004 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Panakeia Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-595,502 vol |
595,502 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Panakeia Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$319,190
+119,101 vol $2.68 each |
714,603 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TJS Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+129,362 vol |
258,724 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TJS Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
-129,362 vol |
129,362 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TJS Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$69,336
+25,872 vol $2.68 each |
155,234 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TJS Energy Fund, LP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-416,027.12
-155,234 vol $2.68 each |
0 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2012-12-11 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2012-12-11 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2013-08-26 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
+515,647 vol |
515,647 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-03-24 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+515,647 vol |
1,031,294 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-515,647 vol |
515,647 | |
Filed 2017-06-05 Tx date 2017-04-21 |
$EPS
Epsilon Energy Ltd. |
Lovoi, John Vincent
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: W.I. Cook Foundation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$276,385
+103,129 vol $2.68 each |
618,776 |