Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2021-05-03 16:11 Tx date 2021-04-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-80,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-05-03 16:09 Tx date 2021-04-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-80,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-05-03 14:08 Tx date 2021-04-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-29,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-05-03 14:04 Tx date 2021-04-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-29,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-01-29 13:30 Tx date 2021-01-27 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$1,020,000
+85,000 vol $12.00 each |
85,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-01 12:52 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-66,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-06-30 15:34 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-33,000 vol |
||
Filed 2020-06-30 15:34 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-33,000 vol |
33,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-16 14:59 Tx date 2019-05-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,000
+250,000 vol $0.10 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-16 14:57 Tx date 2019-05-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,000
+250,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2019-05-16 14:50 Tx date 2019-05-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,000
+250,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2019-05-16 14:48 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-26 Tx date 2018-09-25 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$16,000
+200,000 vol $0.08 each |
230,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-18 Tx date 2017-11-20 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-320,000 vol |
80,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-18 Tx date 2017-11-20 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-320,000 vol |
80,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-18 Tx date 2017-11-20 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-19 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,937.50
-750 vol $5.25 each |
29,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-19 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,280
-1,000 vol $5.28 each |
30,250 | |
Filed 2015-10-19 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,937.50
-750 vol $5.25 each |
29,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-19 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,280
-1,000 vol $5.28 each |
30,250 | |
Filed 2015-10-13 Tx date 2015-10-08 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,325
-250 vol $5.30 each |
31,250 | |
Filed 2015-10-13 Tx date 2015-10-08 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,325
-250 vol $5.30 each |
31,250 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-09-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,325
-250 vol $5.30 each |
31,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-4,240
-800 vol $5.30 each |
31,750 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-09-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-4,240
-800 vol $5.30 each |
31,750 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-09-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,325
-250 vol $5.30 each |
31,500 | |
Filed 2015-09-29 Tx date 2015-09-28 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,385
-450 vol $5.30 each |
32,550 | |
Filed 2015-09-29 Tx date 2015-09-28 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,385
-450 vol $5.30 each |
32,550 | |
Filed 2015-09-09 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$43,320
+11,400 vol $3.80 each |
33,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-09 Tx date 2015-09-08 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$43,320
+11,400 vol $3.80 each |
33,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
33,000 | ||
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2014-04-17 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-28 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Troy James Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
21,600 | ||
Filed 2015-07-28 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Grant Davis Lupien Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
21,600 | ||
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
25,815 | ||
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2014-04-17 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2014-04-17 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Lupien, William A.
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|