Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2018-03-06 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
233,333 | ||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Catherine Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Damian Robert McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Damian Robert McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,716 | ||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Elizabeth Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Elizabeth Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,716 | ||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-09-21 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Four M Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$52,500
+262,500 vol $0.20 each |
||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Virginia Marie McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Virginia Marie McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,716 | ||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-09-21 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Four M Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$52,500
+262,500 vol $0.20 each |
1,012,500 | |
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Alexander David McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Alexander David McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,716 | ||
Filed 2018-01-31 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Catherine Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,716 | ||
Filed 2017-09-22 Tx date 2017-09-21 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Four M Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$52,500
+262,500 vol $0.20 each |
1,012,500 | |
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Damian Robert McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,714 | ||
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Elizabeth Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,714 | ||
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Catherine Anne McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,714 | ||
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Alexander David McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,714 | ||
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Four M Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
750,000 | ||
Filed 2017-08-11 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$PROS
ProSmart Enterprises Inc. (formerly, Sora Capital Corp.) |
McGovern, Myles Martin Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Virginia Marie McGovern (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
285,714 |