Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-03-01 20:07 Tx date 2024-02-29 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+45,000 vol |
139,000 | |
Filed 2023-05-19 16:08 Tx date 2023-05-19 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
94,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-24 15:08 Tx date 2021-12-23 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+25,000 vol |
69,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-07 16:25 Tx date 2021-05-06 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+280,000 vol |
480,000 | |
Filed 2021-03-30 12:27 Tx date 2021-03-25 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2021-03-30 12:26 Tx date 2021-02-02 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-30 12:25 Tx date 2021-03-25 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+44,000 vol |
44,000 | |
Filed 2021-03-30 12:23 Tx date 2021-02-02 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-10 18:01 Tx date 2021-02-02 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Andrea Newall (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
33,333 | ||
Filed 2021-02-10 18:00 Tx date 2021-02-02 |
$MARI
Marimaca Copper Corp. (formerly, Coro Mining Corp.) |
Newall, Geoffrey Clive
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
33,333 |