Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-12-12 22:57 Tx date 2022-12-12 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-10 12:56 Tx date 2022-12-09 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$48,000
+400,000 vol $0.12 each |
600,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-29 12:52 Tx date 2021-01-27 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$360,000
+30,000 vol $12.00 each |
30,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-20 18:31 Tx date 2021-01-13 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$20,000
+200,000 vol $0.10 each |
230,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-20 18:29 Tx date 2021-01-13 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$-20,000
-200,000 vol $0.10 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-30 18:07 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$TIL
Till Capital Corporation |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-27,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2019-05-16 15:38 Tx date 2019-05-15 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$40,000
+400,000 vol $0.10 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-16 15:29 Tx date 2019-05-16 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-18 Tx date 2017-11-20 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2018-05-18 Tx date 2017-11-20 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-400,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-06 Tx date 2017-02-23 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-02-23 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-03-01 |
$SPD
Silver Predator Corp. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$30,000
+500,000 vol $0.06 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-09 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-12,750
-3,000 vol $4.25 each |
193,911 | |
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2014-08-25 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$275,000
+27,500 vol $10.00 each |
27,500 | |
Filed 2015-08-27 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Marissa Lois Mullins Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: John Tyler Rickard Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
24,043 | ||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: John Tyler Rickard Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Jessica Lynn Mullins Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
25,456 | ||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Jessica Lynn Mullins Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-29 Tx date 2014-05-29 |
$TIL
Till Capital Ltd. |
Rickard, John Terrell
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Marissa Lois Mullins Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Restricted Voting Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
25,456 |