Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2020-11-12 16:27 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-38,250 vol |
443,063 | |
Filed 2020-11-12 16:26 Tx date 2020-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-52,500 vol |
481,313 | |
Filed 2020-11-12 16:25 Tx date 2020-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,187
+52,500 vol $0.175 each |
504,200 | |
Filed 2020-11-12 16:24 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,207
+38,250 vol $0.11 each |
542,450 | |
Filed 2020-10-07 17:23 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,207
+38,250 vol $0.11 each |
||
Filed 2020-09-10 17:38 Tx date 2020-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,187
+52,500 vol $0.175 each |
||
Filed 2020-10-07 17:23 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,207
+38,250 vol $0.11 each |
542,450 | |
Filed 2020-09-10 17:38 Tx date 2020-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,187
+52,500 vol $0.175 each |
504,200 | |
Filed 2020-05-29 15:02 Tx date 2020-03-11 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+111,563 vol |
533,813 | |
Filed 2020-05-29 14:55 Tx date 2019-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+114,750 vol |
497,250 | |
Filed 2020-05-29 14:54 Tx date 2020-03-11 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+260,313 vol |
2,058,063 | |
Filed 2020-05-29 14:52 Tx date 2019-10-02 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+267,750 vol |
1,797,750 | |
Filed 2020-04-21 18:02 Tx date 2020-04-20 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson TFSA (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,185
+30,500 vol $0.17 each |
96,650 | |
Filed 2020-04-21 18:02 Tx date 2020-04-20 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson TFSA (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$765.00
+4,500 vol $0.17 each |
66,150 | |
Filed 2020-04-21 18:00 Tx date 2020-04-20 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,335
+25,500 vol $0.17 each |
96,650 | |
Filed 2020-04-21 17:59 Tx date 2020-04-20 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,615
+9,500 vol $0.17 each |
71,150 | |
Filed 2020-03-17 19:18 Tx date 2020-03-11 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,400
+20,000 vol $0.17 each |
303,600 | |
Filed 2020-03-17 19:17 Tx date 2020-03-10 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,950
+34,000 vol $0.175 each |
283,600 | |
Filed 2020-03-17 19:17 Tx date 2020-03-10 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$412.50
+2,500 vol $0.165 each |
249,600 | |
Filed 2020-03-17 19:16 Tx date 2020-03-10 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$19,315
+118,500 vol $0.163 each |
247,100 | |
Filed 2019-12-03 15:06 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$40,500
+75,000 vol $0.54 each |
451,700 | |
Filed 2019-12-03 15:04 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-75,000 vol |
307,500 | |
Filed 2019-09-25 15:29 Tx date 2019-09-25 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$20,020
+28,600 vol $0.70 each |
128,600 | |
Filed 2019-04-18 15:42 Tx date 2019-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+157,500 vol |
382,500 | |
Filed 2019-04-18 15:41 Tx date 2019-04-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+630,000 vol |
1,530,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-20 Tx date 2018-10-25 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+25,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-20 Tx date 2018-10-25 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$101,499
+50,000 vol $2.03 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-20 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-03-05 Tx date 2019-03-05 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$49,000
+50,000 vol $0.98 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-05 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson TFSA (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
61,650 | |
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-123,300 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
61,650 | |
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-123,300 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson TFSA (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-123,300 vol |
376,700 | |
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Roger Swainson TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+61,650 vol |
||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mary Swainson (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-11-19 Tx date 2018-11-13 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+225,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2018-11-19 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$AUSA
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-08-22 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
500,000 | ||
Filed 2018-08-22 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$
Australis Capital Inc. |
Swainson, Roger Irving
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
900,000 |