Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-01-13 11:44 Tx date 2023-01-09 |
$GIVX
Givex Corp. (formerly, Givex Information Technology Group Limited) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$50,000
+100,000 vol $0.50 each |
411,800 | |
Filed 2021-12-13 13:49 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+6,750 vol |
6,750 | |
Filed 2021-12-13 13:47 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-11-30 16:32 Tx date 2021-11-25 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+200,000 vol |
311,800 | |
Filed 2021-11-30 16:30 Tx date 2021-11-25 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$20,000
+125,000 vol $0.16 each |
125,000 | |
Filed 2021-11-30 16:28 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-11-30 16:28 Tx date 2021-11-25 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$230,000
+250,000 vol $0.92 each |
388,563 | |
Filed 2021-11-29 21:40 Tx date 2021-11-24 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-915,320 vol |
111,800 | |
Filed 2021-11-29 21:38 Tx date 2021-11-24 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-11-29 21:37 Tx date 2021-11-24 |
$GIVX
Givex Information Technology Group Limited (formerly County Capital 2 Ltd.) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,134,436 vol |
138,563 | |
Filed 2021-02-25 09:10 Tx date 2021-02-23 |
$CTWO
County Capital 2 Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,027,120 vol |
1,027,120 | |
Filed 2021-02-25 09:09 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$CTWO
County Capital 2 Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-28 09:38 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$
County Capital 2 Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1 | ||
Filed 2021-01-28 09:37 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$
County Capital 2 Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,272,999 | ||
Filed 2020-07-14 10:15 Tx date 2020-07-09 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-14 10:11 Tx date 2018-09-14 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-06-02 16:05 Tx date 2020-06-02 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+20,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-03 22:56 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-768,367 vol |
215,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-03 22:50 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-853,249 vol |
238,751 | |
Filed 2019-06-01 23:51 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+238,751 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-01 23:56 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-01 23:54 Tx date 2018-09-14 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-01 23:53 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+200,000 vol |
1,530,751 | |
Filed 2019-06-01 23:51 Tx date 2019-05-27 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+238,751 vol |
1,330,751 | |
Filed 2019-06-01 23:06 Tx date 2019-05-29 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+90,000 vol |
90,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-01 23:04 Tx date 2018-09-14 |
$ADCO
ADCORE Inc. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-10-30 Tx date 2018-10-26 |
$
County Capital One Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+983,367 vol |
983,367 | |
Filed 2018-10-30 Tx date 2018-09-14 |
$
County Capital One Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-26 Tx date 2018-09-14 |
$
County Capital One Ltd. |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,092,000 | ||
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-744,631 vol |
94,604 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,549,093 vol |
450,907 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,654,549 vol |
845,451 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,210,912 vol |
1,803,933 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-163,494 vol |
20,772 | |
Filed 2016-01-29 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,014,845 vol |
8,014,845 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+7,000,000 vol |
7,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-450,765 vol |
589,235 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+4,000,000 vol |
4,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+7,500,000 vol |
7,500,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-140,964 vol |
184,266 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+250,000 vol |
839,235 |