Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2019-11-08 21:05 Tx date 2019-11-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$8,100
+60,000 vol $0.135 each |
6,013,067 | |
Filed 2019-11-08 21:05 Tx date 2019-11-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,750
+50,000 vol $0.135 each |
5,953,067 | |
Filed 2019-11-08 21:04 Tx date 2019-11-05 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,425
+72,500 vol $0.13 each |
5,903,067 | |
Filed 2019-11-08 21:03 Tx date 2019-11-05 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+170,000 vol |
5,830,567 | |
Filed 2019-10-22 10:26 Tx date 2019-10-18 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Greene, Roger Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,380
+36,500 vol $0.12 each |
5,747,103 | |
Filed 2019-10-03 22:37 Tx date 2019-09-23 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Berholtz, Randy John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+687,621 vol |
687,621 | |
Filed 2019-10-03 22:34 Tx date 2019-04-05 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Berholtz, Randy John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-08-13 07:53 Tx date 2019-08-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Greene, Roger Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,875
+63,000 vol $0.125 each |
5,710,603 | |
Filed 2019-08-13 07:53 Tx date 2019-08-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Greene, Roger Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,040
+42,000 vol $0.12 each |
5,647,603 | |
Filed 2019-08-07 23:41 Tx date 2019-08-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$66,990
+478,500 vol $0.14 each |
5,660,567 | |
Filed 2019-08-07 14:57 Tx date 2019-08-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Dalsin, Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,182,067 | ||
Filed 2019-08-07 14:54 Tx date 2019-08-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Greene, Roger Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,605,603 | ||
Filed 2018-08-10 Tx date 2018-08-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Brann, Edward
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,526,350 | ||
Filed 2018-03-26 Tx date 2016-11-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,526,350 | ||
Filed 2017-06-22 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Vakhitova, Natalia
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-22 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Vakhitova, Natalia
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-06-20 Tx date 2017-06-13 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Chevalier-Jordan, Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2017-02-21 Tx date 2016-11-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-02-21 Tx date 2017-02-17 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$73,132
+194,500 vol $0.376 each |
4,526,350 | |
Filed 2017-02-21 Tx date 2016-11-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,012,000 | ||
Filed 2017-02-08 Tx date 2017-02-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$36,360
+100,000 vol $0.3636 each |
4,269,850 | |
Filed 2017-02-07 Tx date 2017-02-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,960
+11,000 vol $0.36 each |
588,607 | |
Filed 2017-02-07 Tx date 2017-02-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,250
+50,000 vol $0.365 each |
4,169,850 | |
Filed 2017-02-06 Tx date 2017-02-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$36,500
+100,000 vol $0.365 each |
4,119,850 | |
Filed 2017-02-02 Tx date 2017-02-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,175
+49,350 vol $0.3683 each |
4,019,850 | |
Filed 2017-01-26 Tx date 2017-01-26 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$35,870
+105,500 vol $0.34 each |
3,970,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-26 Tx date 2017-01-25 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$14,280
+42,000 vol $0.34 each |
3,865,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-25 Tx date 2017-01-24 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$19,550
+57,500 vol $0.34 each |
3,823,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-24 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$13,600
+40,000 vol $0.34 each |
3,765,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-20 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,212
+15,000 vol $0.3475 each |
3,725,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-19 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$30,913
+87,500 vol $0.3533 each |
3,710,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-20 Tx date 2017-01-19 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,637
+18,500 vol $0.3588 each |
577,607 | |
Filed 2017-01-20 Tx date 2017-01-19 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$30,913
+87,500 vol $0.3533 each |
3,623,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2017-01-09 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$29,600
+80,000 vol $0.37 each |
3,535,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2017-01-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,200
+20,000 vol $0.36 each |
3,455,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-28 Tx date 2016-12-23 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37,000
+100,000 vol $0.37 each |
3,435,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-21 Tx date 2016-12-21 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37,000
+100,000 vol $0.37 each |
3,335,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-19 Tx date 2016-12-19 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$19,000
+50,000 vol $0.38 each |
3,235,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-16 Tx date 2016-12-16 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,591
+14,400 vol $0.3883 each |
559,107 | |
Filed 2016-12-16 Tx date 2016-12-16 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$38,000
+100,000 vol $0.38 each |
3,185,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$39,000
+100,000 vol $0.39 each |
3,085,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2016-12-14 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37,920
+100,000 vol $0.3792 each |
2,985,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-12 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,959
+15,000 vol $0.3973 each |
95,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-09 Tx date 2016-12-09 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,251
+5,700 vol $0.395 each |
544,707 | |
Filed 2016-12-09 Tx date 2016-12-09 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,925
+15,000 vol $0.395 each |
80,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-09 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$39,980
+100,000 vol $0.3998 each |
2,885,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-08 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,850
+15,000 vol $0.39 each |
65,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-07 Tx date 2016-12-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,775
+15,000 vol $0.385 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-07 Tx date 2016-12-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$38,990
+100,000 vol $0.3899 each |
2,785,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-06 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,200
+13,000 vol $0.40 each |
539,007 | |
Filed 2016-12-06 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$40,000
+100,000 vol $0.40 each |
2,685,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-12-05 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,925
+15,000 vol $0.395 each |
35,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-12-05 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$39,590
+100,000 vol $0.3959 each |
2,585,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-12-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,421
+14,400 vol $0.3765 each |
526,007 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-12-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,440
+4,000 vol $0.36 each |
20,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-12-01 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,460
+4,000 vol $0.365 each |
16,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-12-02 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$38,130
+100,000 vol $0.3813 each |
2,485,500 | |
Filed 2016-12-01 Tx date 2016-12-01 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$36,500
+100,000 vol $0.365 each |
2,385,500 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,256
+14,700 vol $0.3576 each |
511,607 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,480
+4,000 vol $0.37 each |
12,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-29 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,430
+4,000 vol $0.3575 each |
8,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,400
+4,000 vol $0.35 each |
4,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-11-30 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$36,380
+100,000 vol $0.3638 each |
2,285,500 | |
Filed 2016-11-28 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,400
+4,000 vol $0.35 each |
496,907 | |
Filed 2016-11-28 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,425
+15,500 vol $0.35 each |
2,185,500 | |
Filed 2016-11-24 Tx date 2016-11-24 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,821
+8,000 vol $0.3527 each |
492,907 | |
Filed 2016-11-24 Tx date 2016-11-24 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,940
+18,000 vol $0.33 each |
2,170,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-24 Tx date 2016-11-24 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,995
+17,000 vol $0.3527 each |
2,152,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-22 Tx date 2016-11-22 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,110
+14,000 vol $0.365 each |
2,135,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-21 Tx date 2016-11-21 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,730
+29,000 vol $0.37 each |
2,121,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-18 Tx date 2016-11-18 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,969
+12,000 vol $0.4141 each |
2,092,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-18 Tx date 2016-11-18 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,070
+5,000 vol $0.4141 each |
484,907 | |
Filed 2016-11-17 Tx date 2016-11-17 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,970
+17,000 vol $0.41 each |
2,080,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-17 Tx date 2016-11-17 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,050
+5,000 vol $0.41 each |
479,907 | |
Filed 2016-11-16 Tx date 2016-11-16 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,005
+13,000 vol $0.385 each |
2,063,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-15 Tx date 2016-11-15 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$39,000
+100,000 vol $0.39 each |
2,050,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-15 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
450,907 | ||
Filed 2016-11-15 Tx date 2016-11-14 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,000
+24,000 vol $0.375 each |
474,907 | |
Filed 2016-11-10 Tx date 2016-11-03 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Brann, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,950,000 | ||
Filed 2016-11-08 Tx date 2016-10-31 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
TerraNova Partners LP
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Vortex Enterprises Corp.; Aventine Management Group Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,074,384 | ||
Filed 2016-09-06 Tx date 2016-09-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Hecksel, Marc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,242
+29,500 vol $0.415 each |
47,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-01 Tx date 2016-09-01 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Hecksel, Marc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,262
+17,500 vol $0.415 each |
17,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-01 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Hecksel, Marc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-06-13 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
93,818 | |
Filed 2016-06-13 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Hecksel, Marc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+800,000 vol |
800,000 | |
Filed 2016-06-13 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Hecksel, Marc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-06-13 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2016-06-13 Tx date 2016-06-08 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Gerber, Jaime Ross
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Shadian, Troy
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-266,182 vol |
33,818 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Shadian, Troy
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-887,273 vol |
112,727 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-163,494 vol |
20,772 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,210,912 vol |
1,803,933 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-744,631 vol |
94,604 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,549,093 vol |
450,907 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,654,549 vol |
845,451 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,210,912 vol |
1,803,933 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-10,203,641 vol |
1,296,359 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Exclamation S.A. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-54,498 vol |
6,924 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-266,182 vol |
33,818 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-744,631 vol |
94,604 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Folmer, Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-266,182 vol |
33,818 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-266,182 vol |
33,818 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: COSTINE MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-88,727 vol |
11,273 | |
Filed 2016-02-08 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Costine Family Trust dated July 30, 2002 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-221,818 vol |
28,182 | |
Filed 2016-01-29 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,014,845 vol |
8,014,845 | |
Filed 2016-01-29 Tx date 2016-01-27 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,014,845 vol |
8,014,845 | |
Filed 2015-08-18 Tx date 2015-08-14 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: COSTINE MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$15,000
+100,000 vol $0.15 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-18 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: COSTINE MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Shadian, Troy
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+7,000,000 vol |
7,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+7,000,000 vol |
7,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-01-01 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Folmer, Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-13 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Shadian, Troy
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-13 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Shadian, Troy
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-13 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Costine Family Trust dated July 30, 2002 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-13 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Costine, David Clyde
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Costine Family Trust dated July 30, 2002 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Halcyon Capital Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-140,964 vol |
184,266 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+250,000 vol |
839,235 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-450,765 vol |
589,235 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+4,000,000 vol |
4,000,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Julie Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+7,500,000 vol |
7,500,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2014-03-06 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Munro, Robert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 1870151 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+11,500,000 vol |
11,500,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-01-01 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Mintz, Gary
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Exclamation S.A. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-46,988 vol |
61,422 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+250,000 vol |
839,235 | |
Filed 2015-07-12 Tx date 2015-07-07 |
$LND
Inspira Financial Inc. (formerly, Chrysalis Capital IX Corporation) |
Lavine, Marc
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Chrysalis Capital Group Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-450,765 vol |
589,235 |