Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,625
+7,500 vol $0.35 each |
702,501 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,500
+10,000 vol $0.35 each |
695,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,665
+4,500 vol $0.37 each |
675,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-07 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,700
+10,000 vol $0.37 each |
685,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ingrid Dahl (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-2,250 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+74,500 vol |
670,501 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ingrid Dahl (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+22,500 vol |
1,192,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-7,450 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 |