Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-09-05 13:58 Tx date 2024-09-05 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,870
+43,000 vol $0.09 each |
90,000 | |
Filed 2024-09-05 13:57 Tx date 2024-09-05 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$595.00
+7,000 vol $0.085 each |
47,000 | |
Filed 2024-08-22 17:29 Tx date 2024-08-14 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,000
+20,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2024-08-19 18:17 Tx date 2024-08-14 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,000
+20,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2024-08-19 18:38 Tx date 2024-08-15 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,000
+10,000 vol $0.10 each |
60,000 | |
Filed 2024-08-19 18:37 Tx date 2024-08-14 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,000
+20,000 vol $0.10 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2024-08-19 18:34 Tx date 2024-08-14 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Cambrian Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$900.00
+10,000 vol $0.09 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2024-08-19 18:32 Tx date 2024-06-11 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Cambrian Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-08-19 18:17 Tx date 2024-08-14 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,000
+20,000 vol $0.10 each |
30,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-05 17:06 Tx date 2024-07-05 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,600
+10,000 vol $0.16 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-05 17:05 Tx date 2024-06-11 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-06-11 18:09 Tx date 2024-06-11 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Maddin, Hugh
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Princeton Copper Corp (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,270,240 | ||
Filed 2024-03-28 15:30 Tx date 2024-03-27 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Coughlan, Terrance Barry
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$52,066
+260,333 vol $0.20 each |
260,333 | |
Filed 2024-03-28 15:28 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Coughlan, Terrance Barry
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:57 Tx date 2024-03-18 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Hanson, Jennifer
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: JC Hanson Corporate Resources Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
65,879 | ||
Filed 2024-03-20 14:10 Tx date 2024-03-18 |
$Q
Quetzal Copper Corp. |
Lloyd, Chris
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
325,984 | ||
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-07 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,700
+10,000 vol $0.37 each |
685,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,625
+7,500 vol $0.35 each |
702,501 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,500
+10,000 vol $0.35 each |
695,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-12 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,665
+4,500 vol $0.37 each |
675,001 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Shepard, Bruce Kenneth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-900 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-900 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+74,500 vol |
670,501 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ingrid Dahl (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+22,500 vol |
1,192,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-7,450 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ingrid Dahl (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-2,250 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Kisser, Darren Darcy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+9,000 vol |
1,664,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Kisser, Darren Darcy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-900 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Laudel, Alfred James
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+9,000 vol |
1,359,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Laudel, Alfred James
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-900 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Ramescu, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+9,000 vol |
789,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Ramescu, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class B
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-900 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Shepard, Bruce Kenneth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+9,000 vol |
1,564,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+9,000 vol |
741,000 | |
Filed 2016-03-04 Tx date 2016-02-29 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
MacLeod, Roger Owen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$-39,100
-85,000 vol $0.46 each |
840,000 | |
Filed 2016-03-04 Tx date 2016-02-29 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
MacLeod, Roger Owen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Richardson GMP Limited in trust for Roger MacLeod (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class A
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$39,100
+85,000 vol $0.46 each |
85,000 | |
Filed 2016-03-04 Tx date 2011-09-30 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
MacLeod, Roger Owen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Richardson GMP Limited in trust for Roger MacLeod (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class A
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Janet Williams (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-66,330
-67,000 vol $0.99 each |
723,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Class A
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$66,330
+67,000 vol $0.99 each |
732,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Shepard, Bruce Kenneth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Shepard, Bruce Kenneth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Ramescu, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Ramescu, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
MacLeod, Roger Owen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
+16,000 vol |
128,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
MacLeod, Roger Owen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,500 vol |
112,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Laudel, Alfred James
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Laudel, Alfred James
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Kisser, Darren Darcy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Kisser, Darren Darcy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dell, Neil Irvine
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$16,000
+16,000 vol $1.00 each |
128,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dell, Neil Irvine
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$22,750
+17,500 vol $1.30 each |
112,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Dahl, Richard Herbert
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-11-23 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$32,000
+32,000 vol $1.00 each |
257,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-27 Tx date 2015-04-13 |
$Q
Questfire Energy Corp. |
Williams, Ronald Andrew
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options Class A
50 - Grant of options
|
$45,500
+35,000 vol $1.30 each |
225,000 |