Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-07-17 22:08 Tx date 2024-07-16 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+350,000 vol |
650,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-17 22:07 Tx date 2024-07-16 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$35,000
+350,000 vol $0.10 each |
710,606 | |
Filed 2024-02-01 23:43 Tx date 2024-01-30 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+550,000 vol |
550,000 | |
Filed 2024-02-01 23:42 Tx date 2024-01-04 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-01-31 21:54 Tx date 2024-01-04 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2024-01-31 21:54 Tx date 2024-01-04 |
$ABND
Abound Energy Inc. |
Morlock, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,790,000 vol |
410,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,900,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-05-05 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,200,000 |