Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2018-06-29 Tx date 2018-06-27 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
McLennan, Neil Edward
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
$90,000
+1,800,000 vol $0.05 each |
12,496,355 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Kakumanu, Swapan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-299,250 vol |
15,750 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Kakumanu, Swapan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,140,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2016-08-16 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Kakumanu, Swapan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-315,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,900,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,790,000 vol |
410,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2014-07-24 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Pidherney, Mervyn
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
+555,500 vol |
||
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2014-07-24 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Pidherney, Mervyn
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-555,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Pidherney, Mervyn
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,427,725 vol |
127,775 | |
Filed 2018-03-11 Tx date 2017-11-21 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Pidherney, Mervyn
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-475,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-05-08 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
McLennan, Neil Edward
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
10,696,355 | ||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-05-05 |
$IES
Intercept Energy Services Inc. |
Morlock, Keith Richard
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,200,000 |