Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-07-24 18:42 Tx date 2023-09-21 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-31,512 vol |
630,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-24 18:40 Tx date 2023-09-21 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-31,512 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-07-24 18:37 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-4,156 vol |
125,000 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 16:07 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-62,927 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 16:06 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+985,912 vol |
1,255,822 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 16:05 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-985,912 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 16:03 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+2,143,744 vol |
3,462,379 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 16:02 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-2,143,744 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 15:59 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: John P. Havens Trust No.2 UA/2/1/2002 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-125,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 15:58 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-188,419 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 15:57 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+1,322,506 vol |
6,723,121 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 15:55 Tx date 2023-08-29 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-1,322,506 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-08 12:47 Tx date 2023-07-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Preferred Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+220,800 vol |
220,800 | |
Filed 2024-02-08 12:46 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-02-08 12:46 Tx date 2023-07-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+314,004 vol |
314,004 | |
Filed 2024-02-08 12:45 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-02-08 12:43 Tx date 2023-07-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Preferred Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-1,766,400 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-08 12:42 Tx date 2023-07-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-2,512,033 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-07 19:48 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Len Mertz Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-16,625 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-07 19:47 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-125,855 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-07 19:46 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-72,734 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-02-06 16:08 Tx date 2024-02-05 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$53,900
+192,500 vol $0.28 each |
367,500 | |
Filed 2024-02-06 16:07 Tx date 2024-02-05 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-80,340 vol |
4,176,059 | |
Filed 2024-02-06 16:06 Tx date 2024-02-05 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$-53,900
-192,500 vol $0.28 each |
4,256,399 | |
Filed 2024-01-23 18:13 Tx date 2024-01-19 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$22,000
+100,000 vol $0.22 each |
2,512,474 | |
Filed 2024-01-23 18:12 Tx date 2024-01-19 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$31,000
+100,000 vol $0.31 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2024-01-23 18:10 Tx date 2023-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: CMI Cornerstone Management Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-8,312 vol |
401,543 | |
Filed 2024-01-23 18:09 Tx date 2023-07-05 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-40,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-01-22 18:00 Tx date 2023-10-01 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Michael and Sherri Mcfadden Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
warrant
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-220,166 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-12-19 17:36 Tx date 2023-12-19 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-86,101 vol |
4,448,899 | |
Filed 2023-12-19 17:35 Tx date 2023-12-19 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$36,300
+165,000 vol $0.22 each |
175,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-19 17:33 Tx date 2023-12-19 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-165,000 vol |
4,535,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-13 12:09 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+6,000,000 vol |
8,000,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 19:04 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
740,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 19:03 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+330,000 vol |
630,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 19:02 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+3,950,000 vol |
4,700,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 19:00 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+330,000 vol |
330,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 19:00 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Cawkell, Kenneth Anthony
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-06-09 18:56 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+330,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-06-09 18:56 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+330,000 vol |
630,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 18:51 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+3,950,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-06-09 18:51 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+3,950,000 vol |
4,700,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 18:47 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
740,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 18:47 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-06-09 15:54 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
900,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 15:51 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+330,000 vol |
661,512 | |
Filed 2023-06-09 15:41 Tx date 2023-06-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+4,250,000 vol |
4,700,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-16 19:30 Tx date 2023-02-16 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Manchester Management Company, LLC
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Manchester Explorer, L.P. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
9,483,568 | ||
Filed 2023-02-02 16:00 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+450,000 vol |
450,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:59 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-450,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:56 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:55 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+600,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:54 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-600,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:53 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-150,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:50 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:49 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:48 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-300,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:41 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
331,512 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:40 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
131,512 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:39 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-300,000 vol |
31,512 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:34 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+240,000 vol |
340,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:33 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:32 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-340,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:28 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:27 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2023-02-02 15:24 Tx date 2023-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
97 - Other
|
-400,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-05-31 18:20 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-31 18:19 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-31 18:17 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
340,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-31 18:15 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
331,512 | |
Filed 2022-05-16 13:08 Tx date 2022-05-16 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,579
+5,000 vol $0.52 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-16 12:07 Tx date 2022-05-16 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,324
+2,500 vol $0.53 each |
5,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-16 11:50 Tx date 2022-05-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,300
+2,500 vol $0.52 each |
2,500 | |
Filed 2022-05-16 11:49 Tx date 2022-04-11 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-04-26 12:35 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$36,000
+90,000 vol $0.40 each |
269,910 | |
Filed 2022-04-26 12:35 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-36,000
-90,000 vol $0.40 each |
62,927 | |
Filed 2022-04-26 12:32 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$750,000
+1,875,000 vol $0.40 each |
5,297,144 | |
Filed 2022-04-26 12:31 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-750,000
-1,875,000 vol $0.40 each |
188,419 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:08 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Len Mertz Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$250,000
+625,000 vol $0.40 each |
2,125,755 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:08 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Len Mertz Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-250,000
-625,000 vol $0.40 each |
16,625 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:07 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$72,000
+180,000 vol $0.40 each |
2,512,033 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:05 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mertz Holdings (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-72,000
-180,000 vol $0.40 each |
125,855 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:04 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$160,000
+400,000 vol $0.40 each |
1,318,635 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 19:02 Tx date 2021-11-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-160,000
-400,000 vol $0.40 each |
72,734 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 14:45 Tx date 2022-04-11 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+450,000 vol |
450,000 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 14:44 Tx date 2022-04-11 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. |
Kalkofen, Don
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-02-15 18:45 Tx date 2022-02-14 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Kay, Denis
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+65,000 vol |
65,000 | |
Filed 2022-02-15 18:44 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Kay, Denis
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-02-15 18:41 Tx date 2022-02-14 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:35 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,917
+5,743 vol $0.86 each |
30,867 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:35 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,772
+2,124 vol $0.83 each |
25,124 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:34 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$847.60
+1,000 vol $0.85 each |
23,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:34 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,470
+8,300 vol $0.90 each |
22,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:34 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,780
+3,100 vol $0.90 each |
13,700 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:33 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,303
+2,614 vol $0.88 each |
10,600 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:33 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,730
+2,000 vol $0.87 each |
7,986 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:32 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,706
+1,900 vol $0.90 each |
5,986 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:32 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,599
+1,886 vol $0.85 each |
4,086 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:31 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$854.90
+1,000 vol $0.85 each |
2,200 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:31 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$268.80
+300 vol $0.90 each |
1,200 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:30 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$269.19
+300 vol $0.90 each |
900 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:30 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$179.40
+200 vol $0.90 each |
600 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:29 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.74
+100 vol $0.90 each |
300 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:28 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.89
+100 vol $0.90 each |
200 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:28 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.93
+100 vol $0.90 each |
100 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:27 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.00
+100 vol $0.89 each |
400 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:26 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.74
+100 vol $0.90 each |
||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:25 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.89
+100 vol $0.90 each |
||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:25 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$89.93
+100 vol $0.90 each |
||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:24 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mallette Havens (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:23 Tx date 2022-01-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,945
+2,271 vol $0.86 each |
3,525,615 | |
Filed 2021-12-31 14:19 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Wright, Jeremy Christopher
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Seatrend Strategy Group (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$336,000
+300,000 vol $1.12 each |
300,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-31 14:17 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Wright, Jeremy Christopher
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Seatrend Strategy Group (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-31 13:09 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
231,512 | |
Filed 2021-12-31 13:08 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev Kumar
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
31,512 | ||
Filed 2021-12-31 11:43 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
O'Gorman, Cedric
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-31 11:43 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
O'Gorman, Cedric
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-30 17:45 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-30 17:45 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Mertz, Phillip J.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-30 17:44 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-30 17:43 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Mertz, Len
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-30 17:40 Tx date 2021-12-28 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+240,000 vol |
240,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-29 16:13 Tx date 2021-12-20 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+240,000 vol |
||
Filed 2021-12-29 16:13 Tx date 2021-12-20 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+240,000 vol |
240,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-29 16:12 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-14 12:47 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: John P. Havens, Jr. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$11,074
+11,300 vol $0.98 each |
27,000 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:46 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: John P. Havens, Jr. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,062
+5,200 vol $0.97 each |
15,700 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:45 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: John P. Havens, Jr. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,185
+10,500 vol $0.97 each |
10,500 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:44 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: John P. Havens, Jr. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-14 12:36 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,975
+13,008 vol $1.00 each |
3,523,344 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:35 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,940
+2,000 vol $0.97 each |
3,510,336 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:34 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$567.96
+600 vol $0.95 each |
3,508,336 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:33 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,009
+2,100 vol $0.96 each |
3,507,736 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:33 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,071
+4,300 vol $0.95 each |
3,505,636 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:32 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,947
+7,400 vol $0.94 each |
3,501,336 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:31 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,489
+1,600 vol $0.93 each |
3,493,936 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:30 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$469.45
+500 vol $0.94 each |
3,492,336 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:28 Tx date 2021-12-13 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$454.21
+492 vol $0.92 each |
3,491,836 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 12:26 Tx date 2021-12-09 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$24,916
+20,000 vol $1.25 each |
3,491,344 | |
Filed 2021-12-13 16:04 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$59,128
+49,200 vol $1.20 each |
3,471,344 | |
Filed 2021-10-08 17:39 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Michael and Sherri Mcfadden Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
warrant
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$385,290
+220,166 vol $1.75 each |
220,166 | |
Filed 2021-10-08 17:38 Tx date 2021-04-12 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Michael and Sherri Mcfadden Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
warrant
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-08 17:34 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Michael and Sherri Mcfadden Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$330,249
+220,166 vol $1.50 each |
220,166 | |
Filed 2021-10-08 17:32 Tx date 2021-04-12 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Michael and Sherri Mcfadden Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-08 17:30 Tx date 2021-04-12 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-09 13:17 Tx date 2021-08-03 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+600,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-09 13:05 Tx date 2021-05-04 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
D'Angelo, Lauren
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-08 10:56 Tx date 2021-08-03 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$1,800,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.90 each |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-08 10:54 Tx date 2021-04-12 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
mcfadden, michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-19 14:57 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$3,937,500
+1,875,000 vol $2.10 each |
||
Filed 2021-05-19 14:57 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,063,419 | ||
Filed 2021-05-19 14:45 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+170,029 vol |
||
Filed 2021-05-19 14:43 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
170,029 | ||
Filed 2021-03-27 14:25 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-27 11:54 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+170,029 vol |
||
Filed 2021-03-27 11:52 Tx date 2017-11-15 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Bakshi, Rajeev
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vincorp Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-27 11:21 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$3,937,500
+1,875,000 vol $2.10 each |
||
Filed 2021-03-27 11:14 Tx date 2021-03-18 |
$ACOG
Alpha Cognition Inc. (formerly Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc.) |
Havens, John P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|