Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-09-04 Tx date 2016-09-01 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Embella Holdings Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,125
-7,500 vol $0.15 each |
1,760,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-04 Tx date 2016-08-31 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Embella Holdings Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-375.00
-2,500 vol $0.15 each |
1,768,000 | |
Filed 2016-08-27 Tx date 2016-08-25 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-4,500
-50,000 vol $0.09 each |
1,270,000 | |
Filed 2016-08-27 Tx date 2016-08-26 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-10,000
-100,000 vol $0.10 each |
1,170,000 | |
Filed 2016-08-27 Tx date 2016-08-22 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$141,200
+3,530,000 vol $0.04 each |
6,425,500 | |
Filed 2016-08-27 Tx date 2016-08-22 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Intrinsic Venture Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
$-141,200
-3,530,000 vol $0.04 each |
0 | |
Filed 2016-08-27 Tx date 2016-08-24 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Embella Holdings Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-900.00
-10,000 vol $0.09 each |
1,770,500 | |
Filed 2016-07-28 Tx date 2016-07-26 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,450
-35,000 vol $0.07 each |
1,320,000 | |
Filed 2016-06-14 Tx date 2016-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Embella Holdings Ltd (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-550.00
-5,000 vol $0.11 each |
1,780,500 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-05-31 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,000
-100,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,905,500 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-05-31 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,000
-100,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,355,000 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-05-31 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Embella Holdings Ltd (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,375
-25,000 vol $0.055 each |
1,785,500 | |
Filed 2016-06-03 Tx date 2016-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-600.00
-10,000 vol $0.06 each |
2,895,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-25 Tx date 2016-05-19 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-600.00
-10,000 vol $0.06 each |
3,005,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$3,125
+62,500 vol $0.05 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,000
+250,000 vol $0.10 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2014-08-18 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$12,500
+62,500 vol $0.20 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,375
+62,500 vol $0.15 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$6,250
+62,500 vol $0.10 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$3,125
+62,500 vol $0.05 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$12,500
+62,500 vol $0.20 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,375
+62,500 vol $0.15 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$6,250
+62,500 vol $0.10 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$3,125
+62,500 vol $0.05 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.05 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$12,500
+62,500 vol $0.20 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.20 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,375
+62,500 vol $0.15 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.15 Options Expiry May 13, 2019
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-13 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options $.10 Options Expiry May 13, 2018
50 - Grant of options
|
$6,250
+62,500 vol $0.10 each |
62,500 | |
Filed 2016-05-03 Tx date 2016-04-29 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,400
-20,000 vol $0.07 each |
3,015,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-28 Tx date 2016-04-28 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,750
-25,000 vol $0.07 each |
3,035,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-28 Tx date 2016-04-25 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,500
-25,000 vol $0.06 each |
3,060,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-19 Tx date 2016-04-14 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,000
-20,000 vol $0.05 each |
3,085,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10_2016
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$50,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10_2016
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$31,400 vol $0.05 each |
$31,400 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2013-06-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2013-06-03 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10_2016
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Convertible Notes Settlement for Operator Debt on Apr 7,2016 Financing Terms
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$
+$827,681 vol $0.05 each |
$827,681 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2014-08-18 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Convertible Notes Settlement for Operator Debt on Apr 7,2016 Financing Terms
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Chan, Lorna
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$46,550 vol $0.05 each |
$46,550 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2014-07-23 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Chan, Lorna
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$53,800 vol $0.05 each |
$53,800 | |
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures On April 7,2016 Financing Terms
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures Creditline-Secured against IP on Apr 7,2016 financing terms
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-12 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures Creditline-Secured against IP on Apr 7,2016 financing terms
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$
+$1,050,000 vol $0.05 each |
$1,050,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-10 Tx date 2016-04-08 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-750.00
-15,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,455,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-10 Tx date 2016-04-05 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,350
-30,000 vol $0.045 each |
3,105,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-10 Tx date 2016-04-06 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Holder: Audrey C. Munro (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,500
-30,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,470,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2016-04-01 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-800.00
-20,000 vol $0.04 each |
3,135,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2016-03-31 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,500
-30,000 vol $0.05 each |
3,155,500 | |
Filed 2016-03-22 Tx date 2016-03-22 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Manji, Faisal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,925
+55,000 vol $0.035 each |
259,500 | |
Filed 2016-03-01 Tx date 2016-02-25 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
99 - Correction of information
|
$827,681
+16,553,620 vol $0.05 each |
16,553,620 | |
Filed 2016-03-01 Tx date 2014-08-18 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Decanex Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-03-01 Tx date 2016-02-25 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
97 - Other
|
$827,681
+16,553,620 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2016-03-01 Tx date 2016-02-25 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
97 - Other
|
$827,681
+16,553,620 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2016-02-29 Tx date 2014-08-18 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Leca, Radu
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-02-28 Tx date 2016-02-23 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units $.05 for one common share and one warrant at $.10
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$1,050,000
+21,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
21,000,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-11 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Munro, James Scott
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,500
+50,000 vol $0.05 each |
3,185,500 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-08 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$475.00
+5,000 vol $0.095 each |
2,094,100 | |
Filed 2015-11-14 Tx date 2015-11-12 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Brokerage Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+3,100,000 vol |
3,100,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-14 Tx date 2015-11-12 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Chan, Lorna
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: TFSA Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-3,100,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-11-14 Tx date 2015-11-12 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Chan, Lorna
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Cash brokerage A/C (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+3,100,000 vol |
3,102,516 | |
Filed 2015-11-14 Tx date 2015-11-12 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TSFA a/c for Sydney Au (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-3,100,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-11-14 Tx date 2013-06-10 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Au, Sydney Wai Kong
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Brokerage Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-07 Tx date 2015-08-04 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-12,500
-100,000 vol $0.125 each |
2,104,100 | |
Filed 2015-08-07 Tx date 2015-08-05 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,400
-15,000 vol $0.16 each |
2,089,100 | |
Filed 2015-08-03 Tx date 2015-07-30 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,920
-12,000 vol $0.16 each |
2,204,100 | |
Filed 2015-07-25 Tx date 2015-07-22 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-25,000 vol |
2,316,100 | |
Filed 2015-07-25 Tx date 2015-07-22 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-100,000 vol |
2,216,100 | |
Filed 2015-07-25 Tx date 2015-07-21 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-75,000 vol |
2,341,100 | |
Filed 2015-07-13 Tx date 2015-07-09 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-6,750
-45,000 vol $0.15 each |
2,416,100 | |
Filed 2015-07-08 Tx date 2015-07-06 |
$AID
Auxellence Health Corporation (formerly 0924888 BC Ltd.) |
Ozols, Ronald Ozols
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-175,000 vol |
2,461,100 |