Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-08-15 15:53 Tx date 2018-06-14 |
$BABY
ASB Capital Inc. |
Puar, Sukvinder Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: SNJ Capital Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-11,900
-140,000 vol $0.085 each |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-18 12:03 Tx date 2018-06-14 |
$BABY
ASB Capital Inc. |
Puar, Sukvinder Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: SNJ Capital Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,950
-70,000 vol $0.085 each |
||
Filed 2022-10-21 11:37 Tx date 2022-10-06 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-888,888 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-10-19 17:32 Tx date 2022-09-02 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-2,225,232 vol |
888,888 | |
Filed 2022-08-04 17:01 Tx date 2022-08-02 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$134,000
+200,000 vol $0.67 each |
650,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-14 09:39 Tx date 2022-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,990 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-06-14 09:38 Tx date 2022-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-06-14 09:36 Tx date 2022-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,999 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-05-30 12:23 Tx date 2022-05-27 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-65,420.46
-48,600 vol $1.35 each |
405,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-30 12:22 Tx date 2022-05-26 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-65,532.24
-48,600 vol $1.35 each |
453,600 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 19:31 Tx date 2022-05-25 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-67,699.80
-48,600 vol $1.39 each |
502,200 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 19:30 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-65,551.68
-48,600 vol $1.35 each |
550,800 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 19:30 Tx date 2022-05-17 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-772.98
-600 vol $1.29 each |
599,400 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 12:29 Tx date 2022-05-25 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-67,699.80
-48,600 vol $1.39 each |
502,200 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 12:29 Tx date 2022-05-25 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-67,699.80
-48,600 vol $1.39 each |
||
Filed 2022-05-26 12:29 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-65,551.68
-48,600 vol $1.35 each |
550,800 | |
Filed 2022-05-26 12:29 Tx date 2022-05-24 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-65,551.68
-48,600 vol $1.35 each |
||
Filed 2022-05-26 12:28 Tx date 2022-05-17 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-772.98
-600 vol $1.29 each |
||
Filed 2022-05-26 12:28 Tx date 2022-05-17 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-772.98
-600 vol $1.29 each |
599,400 | |
Filed 2022-04-11 15:58 Tx date 2022-04-08 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-60.00
-600,000 vol $0.0001 each |
636,030 | |
Filed 2022-04-11 15:58 Tx date 2022-04-08 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$60.00
+600,000 vol $0.0001 each |
600,000 | |
Filed 2022-04-11 15:55 Tx date 2022-04-11 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$60.00
+600,000 vol $0.0001 each |
||
Filed 2022-04-11 15:54 Tx date 2022-04-11 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-60.00
-600,000 vol $0.0001 each |
||
Filed 2021-12-14 09:05 Tx date 2021-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,992 vol |
59,990 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 09:02 Tx date 2021-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
240,006 | |
Filed 2021-12-14 09:00 Tx date 2021-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,997 vol |
299,999 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:47 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
650,000 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:45 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Shamir, Shay Shlomo
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+56,250 vol |
487,500 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:43 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+56,250 vol |
487,500 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:40 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
650,000 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:38 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
650,000 | |
Filed 2021-11-15 10:34 Tx date 2021-11-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Ronen, Eli
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+87,500 vol |
437,500 | |
Filed 2021-06-15 14:30 Tx date 2021-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,992 vol |
119,982 | |
Filed 2021-06-15 14:28 Tx date 2021-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
480,012 | |
Filed 2021-06-15 14:25 Tx date 2021-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,997 vol |
599,996 | |
Filed 2021-05-17 12:38 Tx date 2019-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$93,750
+375,000 vol $0.25 each |
375,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-17 12:35 Tx date 2021-05-13 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$152,249
+75,000 vol $2.03 each |
450,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-14 10:18 Tx date 2019-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$87,500
+350,000 vol $0.25 each |
||
Filed 2021-01-22 14:36 Tx date 2021-01-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Barash, Ofer Yonatan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$612,500
+175,000 vol $3.50 each |
175,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-22 14:32 Tx date 2020-12-23 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Barash, Ofer Yonatan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-22 14:28 Tx date 2020-12-23 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Barash, Ofer Yonatan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-12-15 13:12 Tx date 2020-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,992 vol |
179,974 | |
Filed 2020-12-15 13:09 Tx date 2020-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
720,018 | |
Filed 2020-12-15 13:05 Tx date 2020-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,997 vol |
899,993 | |
Filed 2020-10-08 19:11 Tx date 2020-10-06 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+888,888 vol |
3,114,120 | |
Filed 2020-10-08 19:06 Tx date 2020-10-06 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,999,998
+1,777,777 vol $2.25 each |
10,678,706 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:45 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
575,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:41 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Shamir, Shay Shlomo
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+56,250 vol |
431,250 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:38 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+56,250 vol |
431,250 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:34 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
575,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:29 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+75,000 vol |
575,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:23 Tx date 2020-07-20 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Ronen, Eli
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+350,000 vol |
350,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-24 13:19 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Ronen, Eli
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-07-24 13:17 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Ronen, Eli
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-06-15 15:06 Tx date 2020-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,992 vol |
239,966 | |
Filed 2020-06-15 15:04 Tx date 2020-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
960,024 | |
Filed 2020-06-15 15:01 Tx date 2020-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,997 vol |
1,199,990 | |
Filed 2020-03-16 16:38 Tx date 2019-11-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-153,125 vol |
21,875 | |
Filed 2020-03-10 16:08 Tx date 2020-03-02 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,225,232 | ||
Filed 2020-03-10 16:07 Tx date 2020-03-02 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
NewH2 Limited
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,900,929 | ||
Filed 2020-02-11 10:16 Tx date 2020-02-07 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Michael Azar (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$734,993
+2,939,975 vol $0.25 each |
2,939,975 | |
Filed 2020-02-11 10:13 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Michael Azar (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-02-11 10:11 Tx date 2020-02-07 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Uriel Kesler (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
13,230,022 | |
Filed 2020-02-11 10:09 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Uriel Kesler (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-02-11 10:06 Tx date 2020-02-07 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Hamutal Yitzhak (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
13,230,022 | |
Filed 2020-02-11 10:02 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: I.B.I. Trust Management TR Hamutal Yitzhak (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 13:03 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 12:25 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$734,993
+2,939,975 vol $0.25 each |
||
Filed 2019-06-17 15:43 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
||
Filed 2019-12-16 11:24 Tx date 2019-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-59,992 vol |
299,958 | |
Filed 2019-12-16 11:22 Tx date 2019-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-240,006 vol |
1,200,030 | |
Filed 2019-12-16 11:19 Tx date 2019-12-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-299,997 vol |
1,499,987 | |
Filed 2019-10-18 20:05 Tx date 2019-10-17 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Mann, Satwinder
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$75,000
+250,000 vol $0.30 each |
650,000 | |
Filed 2019-10-11 17:38 Tx date 2019-10-09 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-39,994 vol |
359,950 | |
Filed 2019-10-11 17:32 Tx date 2019-10-09 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-160,003 vol |
1,440,036 | |
Filed 2019-10-11 17:27 Tx date 2019-10-09 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-199,998 vol |
1,799,984 | |
Filed 2019-06-26 13:14 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: A-Labs Finance and Advisory Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+1,000,000 vol |
2,200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-26 13:12 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: A-Labs Finance and Advisory Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+1,200,000 vol |
1,200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-26 13:06 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: A-Labs Finance and Advisory Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-20 13:49 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+399,944 vol |
399,944 | |
Filed 2019-06-20 13:48 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Cambridge House International Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-20 13:46 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+1,600,039 vol |
1,600,039 | |
Filed 2019-06-20 13:44 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Leighton Bocking (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-20 13:43 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+1,999,982 vol |
1,999,982 | |
Filed 2019-06-20 13:41 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Benjamin Curry (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-20 11:29 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+175,000 vol |
175,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-20 11:27 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Cohen, Doron Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-20 10:35 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Mann, Satwinder
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
250,000 | ||
Filed 2019-06-20 10:33 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Mann, Satwinder
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-06-18 13:10 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+14,024,458 vol |
14,024,458 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 13:07 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 13:07 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 13:04 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 13:03 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
13,230,022 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 13:01 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Yitzhak, Hamutal
4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 12:38 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+3,116,546 vol |
3,116,546 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 12:35 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 12:34 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 12:31 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 12:25 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$734,993
+2,939,975 vol $0.25 each |
2,939,975 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 12:23 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Azar, Michael
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 12:11 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+636,030 vol |
636,030 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 12:03 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+600,000 vol |
1,236,030 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 12:00 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+600,000 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:58 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+375,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 11:54 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Shamir, Shay Shlomo
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+375,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 11:29 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+600,000 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:29 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+600,000 vol |
1,236,030 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 11:27 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+636,030 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:27 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+636,030 vol |
636,030 | |
Filed 2019-06-18 11:25 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:24 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+375,000 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:22 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:21 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Halevi, Reuben
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:05 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Shamir, Shay Shlomo
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+375,000 vol |
||
Filed 2019-06-18 11:01 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Shamir, Shay Shlomo
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-17 16:51 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+14,024,458 vol |
14,024,458 | |
Filed 2019-06-17 16:35 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-17 16:08 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-17 16:02 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-17 15:43 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$3,307,505
+13,230,022 vol $0.25 each |
13,230,022 | |
Filed 2019-06-17 15:34 Tx date 2019-06-12 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Kesler, Uriel
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-14 10:18 Tx date 2019-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$87,500
+350,000 vol $0.25 each |
350,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-14 10:03 Tx date 2015-05-01 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-06-14 10:02 Tx date 2019-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+56,000 vol |
56,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-14 10:01 Tx date 2019-06-14 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-280,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2019-06-14 09:56 Tx date 2019-04-05 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
$14,000
+280,000 vol $0.05 each |
280,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-14 09:54 Tx date 2015-05-01 |
$BABY
Else Nutrition Holdings Inc. (formerly ASB Capital Inc.) |
Puar, Sokhie
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|