Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Recent filings | ||||||
Filed 2024-10-04 19:07 Tx date 2024-09-27 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Balaban, Daniel Issac
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$24,000
+400,000 vol $0.06 each |
1,070,246 | |
Filed 2024-10-04 19:07 Tx date 2024-09-26 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Balaban, Daniel Issac
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$700.00
+10,000 vol $0.07 each |
670,246 | |
Older filings | ||||||
Filed 2024-09-27 08:08 Tx date 2024-09-24 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: ScotiaMcLeod a/c 439-71360-13 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+1,900,881 vol |
3,168,135 | |
Filed 2024-09-27 08:06 Tx date 2024-09-24 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Prairie Merchant Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-1,900,881 vol |
9,504,407 | |
Filed 2024-08-23 12:57 Tx date 2024-03-20 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Ventum Financial Corp. a/c 026-1342-0 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$99,999
+588,235 vol $0.17 each |
588,235 | |
Filed 2024-08-23 12:55 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Ventum Financial Corp. a/c 026-1342-0 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-08-10 21:52 Tx date 2024-08-09 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,504
+62,000 vol $0.1533 each |
13,297,294 | |
Filed 2024-07-24 19:34 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: ScotiaMcLeod a/c 439-71360-13 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+1,267,254 vol |
1,267,254 | |
Filed 2024-07-24 19:33 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: ScotiaMcLeod a/c 439-71360-13 (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-07-24 19:32 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Prairie Merchant Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-1,267,254 vol |
11,405,288 | |
Filed 2024-06-25 22:37 Tx date 2024-06-24 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
570,588 | |
Filed 2024-03-27 18:28 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Balaban, Daniel Issac
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
100,000 | ||
Filed 2024-03-27 18:27 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Balaban, Daniel Issac
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
660,246 | ||
Filed 2024-03-27 18:25 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Fullbrook Thorpe Investments LLP
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,312,500 | ||
Filed 2024-03-27 18:23 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Fullbrook Thorpe Investments LLP
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
14,005,874 | ||
Filed 2024-03-27 18:21 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Stokes, Adrian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
600,000 | ||
Filed 2024-03-27 18:16 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Ryan, Candace Jilyn
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2024-03-22 19:17 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LRW 40Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
-2,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 19:07 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+1,506,594 vol |
1,506,594 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 19:05 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LRW 40Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-823,529 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-22 18:42 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+330,123 vol |
330,123 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 18:42 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+330,123 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-22 18:40 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:49 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LRW 40Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-823,529 vol |
1,176,471 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:49 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: LRW 40Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-823,529 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:44 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Marnie Bondar (RSP) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+807,843 vol |
807,843 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:43 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Marnie Bondar (RSP) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:42 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Marnie Bondar (TFSA) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+147,059 vol |
147,059 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:41 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Marnie Bondar (TFSA) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:40 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Darren Bondar (TFSA) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+600,588 vol |
600,588 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:38 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Odyssey Trust Company TR Darren Bondar (TFSA) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 17:35 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+9,399,412 vol |
13,235,294 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:32 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,685,118 vol |
3,835,882 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 17:01 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+235,294 vol |
470,588 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 16:58 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+235,294 vol |
235,294 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 16:56 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
-800,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 16:49 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:49 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:45 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+1,506,594 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:45 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+1,506,594 vol |
1,506,594 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 16:45 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+1,506,594 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:42 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
-2,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 16:37 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,000,000 | ||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:07 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Prairie Merchant Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
312,500 | ||
Filed 2024-03-22 16:05 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Prairie Merchant Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
12,672,542 | ||
Filed 2024-03-22 15:51 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+400,000 vol |
2,141,176 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 15:51 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+800,000 vol |
1,741,176 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 15:50 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-329,412 vol |
941,176 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 15:49 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-329,412 vol |
1,270,588 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 15:00 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-164,706 vol |
470,588 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 14:59 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-164,706 vol |
635,294 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 14:46 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+101,000 vol |
1,865,706 | |
Filed 2024-03-22 14:33 Tx date 2024-03-19 |
$BLAZ
Hempalta Corp. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,235,294 vol |
1,764,706 | |
Filed 2022-01-26 12:12 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Ginevsky, Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-26 12:12 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Ginevsky, Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-26 12:11 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Ginevsky, Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-25 18:05 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
800,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 18:04 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 18:04 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Wilson, Russell Liam
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:51 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$100,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.10 each |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:51 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
800,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:50 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+400,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:49 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
STEINBERG, CRAIG OWEN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-25 17:45 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$102,100
+1,021,000 vol $0.10 each |
6,521,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:44 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+800,000 vol |
1,600,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:44 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+800,000 vol |
800,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-25 17:38 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Bondar, Darren Hartley
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-22 12:30 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Verbuck, Robert Roman
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+200,000 vol $0.10 each |
400,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-22 12:25 Tx date 2022-01-21 |
$BLAZ
Trail Blazing Ventures Ltd. |
Verbuck, Robert Roman
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: New Roman Empire Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+50,000 vol $0.10 each |
2,050,000 |