Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-01-04 10:17 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$20,000
+400,000 vol $0.05 each |
800,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-03 15:23 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ierfino, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: EGI Holdings Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$30,000
+600,000 vol $0.05 each |
600,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-03 15:21 Tx date 2021-06-29 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ierfino, Edward
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: EGI Holdings Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-07-23 10:12 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: dimitri spyropoulos (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,000 | ||
Filed 2020-07-23 10:11 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 91405357 quebec inc (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
15,000 | ||
Filed 2020-07-23 10:10 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Stavros Spyropoulos (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
10,000 | ||
Filed 2019-05-17 16:17 Tx date 2019-05-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ishak, Nabil
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$402.50
+3,500 vol $0.115 each |
403,500 | |
Filed 2019-05-09 11:09 Tx date 2019-05-07 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,795
+34,500 vol $0.11 each |
834,500 | |
Filed 2019-04-23 12:03 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Bouchard, Denis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$10,377
+103,779 vol $0.10 each |
103,779 | |
Filed 2019-04-23 09:47 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+103,779 vol |
103,779 | |
Filed 2019-04-23 09:43 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-22 08:24 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-20 16:36 Tx date 2019-04-20 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Bouchard, Denis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$10,377
+103,779 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2019-04-19 09:17 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-22 08:24 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
103,779 | ||
Filed 2019-04-19 09:17 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-20 16:36 Tx date 2019-04-20 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Bouchard, Denis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$10,377
+103,779 vol $0.10 each |
103,779 | |
Filed 2019-04-20 16:32 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Bouchard, Denis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-19 09:17 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
103,779 | ||
Filed 2019-04-17 20:49 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Provencher, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+103,778 vol |
103,778 | |
Filed 2019-04-17 20:48 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Provencher, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-17 20:45 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Pronovost, Jean-Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+103,778 vol |
103,778 | |
Filed 2019-04-17 20:44 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Pronovost, Jean-Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-17 20:42 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Soares, Octavio
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+103,778 vol |
103,778 | |
Filed 2019-04-17 20:40 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Soares, Octavio
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-17 15:48 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ishak, Nabil
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$10,377
+103,779 vol $0.10 each |
103,779 | |
Filed 2019-04-17 15:42 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ishak, Nabil
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-17 12:32 Tx date 2019-04-16 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+103,779 vol |
103,779 | |
Filed 2019-04-17 12:30 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-05 Tx date 2018-09-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-05 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-02-05 Tx date 2018-09-17 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-05 Tx date 2018-09-17 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-02 Tx date 2018-09-17 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-02-02 Tx date 2018-09-17 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-02-01 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Ishak, Nabil
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-31 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
8419175 Canada Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
700,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-29 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
paradias, john
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
800,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-29 Tx date 2018-09-17 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Rona, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-27 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Pronovost, Jean-Robert
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
200,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-26 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Bouchard, Denis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-23 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Provencher, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
200,000 | ||
Filed 2019-01-23 Tx date 2019-01-22 |
$BOLD
Bold Capital Enterprises Ltd. |
Soares, Octavio
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 |