Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-10-03 20:40 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-10-03 20:40 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-10-03 20:40 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-10-03 20:39 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-10-03 19:24 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
444,444 | ||
Filed 2022-10-03 19:23 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
666,667 | ||
Filed 2022-10-03 19:21 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
444,444 | ||
Filed 2022-10-03 19:19 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
666,667 | ||
Filed 2004-02-17 17:00 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2004-02-17 16:59 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2004-02-17 16:59 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2004-02-17 16:58 Tx date 2004-01-29 |
$BVE
Bayswater Ventures Corp. |
Eckhof, Klaus Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Corporate & Resource Consultants (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-10-15 Tx date 2015-10-09 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
Fulcher, Douglas
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-285.00
-19,000 vol $0.015 each |
1,045,400 | |
Filed 2015-10-15 Tx date 2015-10-09 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
Fulcher, Douglas
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-105.00
-7,000 vol $0.015 each |
1,038,400 | |
Filed 2015-10-15 Tx date 2015-10-13 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
Fulcher, Douglas
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-675.00
-45,000 vol $0.015 each |
993,400 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-23 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
beukman, eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Pender Street Corporate Consulting Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-61,720.20
-411,468 vol $0.15 each |
0 | |
Filed 2015-09-22 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
beukman, eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Pender Street Corporate Consulting Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-22,500
-1,500,000 vol $0.015 each |
411,468 | |
Filed 2015-08-28 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
beukman, eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Pender Street Corporate Consulting Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,110
-74,000 vol $0.015 each |
1,911,468 | |
Filed 2015-07-31 Tx date 2015-07-28 |
$BVE
Burnstone Ventures Inc. |
beukman, eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Pender Street Corporate Consulting Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,890
-126,000 vol $0.015 each |
1,985,468 |