Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2023-01-09 16:27 Tx date 2022-12-16 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Zipfel, Gary Gene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,444,000 | ||
Filed 2022-04-25 13:11 Tx date 2022-04-09 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$27,958
+69,895 vol $0.40 each |
1,480,476 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 12:53 Tx date 2022-04-14 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+69,895 vol |
||
Filed 2022-04-25 11:45 Tx date 2022-04-14 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+69,895 vol |
||
Filed 2022-04-25 11:45 Tx date 2022-04-14 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+69,895 vol |
69,895 | |
Filed 2022-04-25 11:44 Tx date 2018-04-09 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-03-15 12:40 Tx date 2022-03-14 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,397
+6,000 vol $0.3996 each |
1,410,581 | |
Filed 2022-03-11 23:09 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,640
+4,000 vol $0.41 each |
1,404,581 | |
Filed 2022-03-11 23:07 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,640
+4,000 vol $0.41 each |
||
Filed 2022-03-11 17:47 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,640
+4,000 vol $0.41 each |
||
Filed 2022-03-11 17:47 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,640
+4,000 vol $0.41 each |
1,795,242 | |
Filed 2022-03-09 20:31 Tx date 2022-03-09 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,250
+25,000 vol $0.41 each |
1,400,581 | |
Filed 2022-03-09 10:08 Tx date 2022-03-03 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,941
+9,151 vol $0.54 each |
1,775,742 | |
Filed 2022-03-08 21:59 Tx date 2022-03-08 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,054
+10,000 vol $0.51 each |
1,782,091 | |
Filed 2022-03-08 21:59 Tx date 2022-03-08 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,750
+5,500 vol $0.50 each |
1,772,091 | |
Filed 2022-03-03 09:50 Tx date 2022-03-02 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Carl, Richard G.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$20,400
+51,000 vol $0.40 each |
91,902 | |
Filed 2022-01-18 21:11 Tx date 2022-01-13 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+259,000 vol |
1,766,591 | |
Filed 2022-01-18 21:10 Tx date 2022-01-13 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-259,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:36 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
380,434 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:33 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Martin, Larry Howard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
651,304 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:31 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
McKnight, Robert Buchner, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
651,304 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:28 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+891,306 vol |
1,500,001 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:22 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
517,391 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:21 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+24,200 vol |
120,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:18 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+225,000 vol |
572,826 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:16 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+304,000 vol |
397,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:14 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,217,393 vol |
1,500,001 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:13 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+167,000 vol |
259,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:10 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,213,045 vol |
1,500,001 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 22:08 Tx date 2021-12-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+727,000 vol |
942,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 12:39 Tx date 2018-06-29 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,500,000 | ||
Filed 2018-07-03 21:09 Tx date 2018-06-29 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-12-22 13:23 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$710.00
+2,000 vol $0.355 each |
1,507,591 | |
Filed 2021-12-22 13:23 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,649
+12,739 vol $0.365 each |
1,505,591 | |
Filed 2021-12-22 13:21 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,138
+8,369 vol $0.375 each |
1,492,852 | |
Filed 2021-12-09 16:44 Tx date 2021-12-09 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$989.25
+2,500 vol $0.3957 each |
67,717 | |
Filed 2021-12-09 15:36 Tx date 2021-12-09 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,504
+15,000 vol $0.50 each |
1,484,483 | |
Filed 2021-10-26 16:57 Tx date 2021-10-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+1,053,167 vol |
1,375,581 | |
Filed 2021-10-26 16:55 Tx date 2021-10-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+211,359 vol |
1,469,483 | |
Filed 2021-10-26 16:53 Tx date 2021-10-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+207,010 vol |
1,552,077 | |
Filed 2021-10-05 18:37 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+92,000 vol |
92,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-05 18:35 Tx date 2018-06-29 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-01 19:26 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+217,391 vol |
217,391 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 19:25 Tx date 2021-09-21 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-01 19:24 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+95,800 vol |
95,800 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 19:24 Tx date 2021-09-21 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-01 19:22 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+93,000 vol |
93,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 19:21 Tx date 2020-09-07 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-01 19:20 Tx date 2021-10-01 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
56 - Grant of rights
|
+215,000 vol |
215,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 19:19 Tx date 2018-09-06 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights RSUs
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-10-01 19:13 Tx date 2021-09-21 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Meghan Elizabeth
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
130,434 | ||
Filed 2021-08-06 10:06 Tx date 2021-08-06 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Winch, Alexander David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-9,430,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-07-06 17:04 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: CDS&Co. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$500.28
+379 vol $1.32 each |
379 | |
Filed 2021-07-06 17:04 Tx date 2018-06-29 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: CDS&Co. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-06 17:02 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$6,545
+4,959 vol $1.32 each |
322,414 | |
Filed 2021-07-06 16:54 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$347.16
+263 vol $1.32 each |
1,345,067 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:59 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,313,044 vol |
286,956 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:56 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,217,392 vol |
282,608 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:53 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-13,391,305 vol |
608,695 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:50 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
McKnight, Robert Buchner, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-8,828,696 vol |
401,304 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:48 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Martin, Larry Howard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-8,828,696 vol |
401,304 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:45 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,652,174 vol |
347,826 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 20:42 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Carl, Richard G.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,869,566 vol |
130,434 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 14:48 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,000,000 | ||
Filed 2021-05-28 14:12 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,869,566 vol |
130,434 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 14:10 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-367,927 vol |
16,723 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 14:09 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-367,927 vol |
16,723 | |
Filed 2021-05-28 14:06 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
384,650 | ||
Filed 2021-05-28 14:01 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
384,650 | ||
Filed 2021-04-15 09:15 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-05 12:19 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-05 10:58 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-03 09:21 Tx date 2021-04-02 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-03 09:19 Tx date 2021-04-02 |
$CHAL
Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd. |
Secord, Scott Lawrence
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-27 22:43 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,826,087 vol |
173,913 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 22:39 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,982,153 vol |
90,097 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 22:30 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,073,914 vol |
276,086 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 22:25 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
McKnight, Robert Buchner, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-489,740 vol |
22,260 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 21:24 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,434,783 vol |
65,217 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 20:55 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Yapp, Jeffrey Brooks
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-29,585,696 vol |
1,344,804 | |
Filed 2021-05-27 20:48 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Carl, Richard G.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-899,860 vol |
40,902 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:48 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Varghese, John
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-27,678,733 vol |
1,258,124 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:43 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
McKnight, Robert Buchner, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-489,740 vol |
22,260 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:41 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Marchington, Andrew Charles
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,434,783 vol |
65,217 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:36 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Winch, Alexander David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-5,654,855 vol |
257,038 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:24 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Karl Rickard Miller Jr. Revocable Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-332,266 vol |
15,102 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 22:21 Tx date 2021-05-25 |
$CHAL
Chalice Brands Ltd. (Formerly, Golden Leaf Holdings Ltd.) |
Miller, Karl Rickard, Jr.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,984,022 vol |
317,455 |