Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2020-02-29 18:08 Tx date 2020-02-19 |
$EA
TWX Group Holding Limited (formerly, EA Education Group Inc.) |
Huang, Yongzhi
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: DEWELL EDUCATION AND CAREER SERVICE LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$100,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-02-29 17:58 Tx date 2020-01-13 |
$EA
TWX Group Holding Limited (formerly, EA Education Group Inc.) |
Huang, Yongzhi
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: DEWELL EDUCATION AND CAREER SERVICE LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-02-29 17:55 Tx date 2020-02-19 |
$EA
TWX Group Holding Limited (formerly, EA Education Group Inc.) |
Huang, Yongzhi
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: DEWELL EDUCATION AND CAREER SERVICE LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$100,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-02-29 17:49 Tx date 2020-01-13 |
$EA
TWX Group Holding Limited (formerly, EA Education Group Inc.) |
Huang, Yongzhi
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: DEWELL EDUCATION AND CAREER SERVICE LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-11-20 12:23 Tx date 2019-11-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-100,000
-5,000,000 vol $0.02 each |
5,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-11-20 12:21 Tx date 2019-11-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-700,000
-10,000,000 vol $0.07 each |
0 | |
Filed 2019-11-19 22:41 Tx date 2019-11-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-100,000
-5,000,000 vol $0.02 each |
5,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-11-19 22:37 Tx date 2019-11-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-700,000
-10,000,000 vol $0.07 each |
0 | |
Filed 2019-06-11 19:12 Tx date 2019-06-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$150,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
10,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-11 19:10 Tx date 2019-06-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$150,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
10,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-11 14:36 Tx date 2019-06-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$150,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
10,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-11 14:27 Tx date 2019-06-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$150,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
10,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-27 16:54 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$600,000
+8,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
8,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-27 16:53 Tx date 2016-04-18 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-05-27 16:52 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$600,000
+8,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
8,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-27 16:51 Tx date 2016-04-18 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Ding, Yongbiao
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Eastern Sun Capital II Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-05-27 16:39 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$800,000
+8,000,000 vol $0.10 each |
8,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-27 16:36 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-05-27 16:35 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$600,000
+8,000,000 vol $0.075 each |
8,000,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-27 16:33 Tx date 2019-05-23 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Eastern Sun Capital II Corp.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-09 15:12 Tx date 2019-04-05 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Golden Brick Family Trust
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,333,333 | ||
Filed 2019-04-09 15:07 Tx date 2019-04-05 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Xu, Wen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Golden Brick Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$499,999
+8,333,333 vol $0.06 each |
8,333,333 | |
Filed 2019-04-09 15:06 Tx date 2015-02-18 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Xu, Wen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Golden Brick Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-03-06 Tx date 2019-03-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Wang, WeiDong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-13,440,000 vol |
960,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-06 Tx date 2019-03-06 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Xu, Wen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-67,200,000 vol |
4,800,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-06 Tx date 2018-08-31 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. |
Wang, WeiDong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-144,000
-14,400,000 vol $0.01 each |
14,400,000 | |
Filed 2016-06-02 Tx date 2016-05-26 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. (formerly, Kenieba Goldfields Ltd.) |
Wang, WeiDong
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-1,680,000
-9,600,000 vol $0.175 each |
28,800,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-24 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. (formerly, Kenieba Goldfields Ltd.) |
Sadeddin, Sara
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,500,000 | ||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$EA
EA Education Group Inc. (formerly, Kenieba Goldfields Ltd.) |
Wen, Congban
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|