Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-01-08 15:25 Tx date 2021-12-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$2,000,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2022-01-08 15:22 Tx date 2021-12-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$2,000,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2021-08-27 13:34 Tx date 2021-08-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,002
-20 vol $150.10 each |
120,143 | |
Filed 2021-08-27 13:33 Tx date 2021-08-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-47.50
-500 vol $0.095 each |
120,163 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:45 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,265.05
-5,090 vol $0.445 each |
120,663 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:44 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-488.40
-1,100 vol $0.444 each |
125,753 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:43 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-4,549.61
-10,270 vol $0.443 each |
126,853 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:43 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,569.20
-12,600 vol $0.442 each |
137,123 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:42 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-33,400.84
-75,911 vol $0.44 each |
149,723 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:41 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,433.774
-3,266 vol $0.439 each |
225,634 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 20:41 Tx date 2021-01-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,186.496
-4,992 vol $0.438 each |
228,900 | |
Filed 2021-01-07 18:09 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,000,000 vol |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-07 18:07 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,000,000 vol |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-07 18:04 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,000,000 vol |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-07 18:00 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+1,400,000 vol |
4,200,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-19 14:01 Tx date 2020-12-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+$2,000,000 vol |
$2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-19 14:00 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-12-19 13:56 Tx date 2020-12-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+$2,000,000 vol |
$2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-19 13:55 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-12-19 13:47 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-12-19 13:47 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
$2,000,000 | ||
Filed 2020-12-19 13:43 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Debentures Euro 4.0 Million Dec 2020
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-19 19:37 Tx date 2020-05-13 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$758.40
+3,792 vol $0.20 each |
233,892 | |
Filed 2020-03-27 14:11 Tx date 2020-03-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,800
+20,000 vol $0.14 each |
230,100 | |
Filed 2020-03-27 14:10 Tx date 2020-03-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,500
+70,000 vol $0.15 each |
210,100 | |
Filed 2020-03-27 14:09 Tx date 2020-03-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,800
+30,000 vol $0.16 each |
140,100 | |
Filed 2020-03-25 16:11 Tx date 2020-03-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$362.50
+2,500 vol $0.145 each |
110,100 | |
Filed 2020-03-25 16:06 Tx date 2020-03-20 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$750.00
+5,000 vol $0.15 each |
107,600 | |
Filed 2020-01-15 10:04 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 16:13 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 16:10 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-2,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 16:09 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-840,909 vol |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 16:08 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-175,000 vol |
2,840,909 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 16:05 Tx date 2017-02-16 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-55,980 vol |
3,015,909 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:55 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:55 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-3,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:53 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-2,211,977 vol |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:48 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:46 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-2,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:45 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-574,747 vol |
2,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:36 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,800,000 vol |
2,800,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:35 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-4,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:33 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-2,934,594 vol |
4,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-09 15:28 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-1,200,000 vol |
6,934,594 | |
Filed 2020-01-06 09:48 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-03 10:06 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2019-08-14 03:55 Tx date 2019-08-13 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds 7.25% Sr Secured Bonds
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-$3,000,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2018-08-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Knight, David Allan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-50,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-09-05 Tx date 2008-02-01 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: ROJAFI (11431872) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-05 Tx date 2018-09-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: ROJAFI (11431872) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+317,629 vol |
3,437,629 | |
Filed 2018-09-05 Tx date 2018-09-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-317,629 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-09-05 Tx date 2018-09-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-3,120,000 vol |
317,629 | |
Filed 2018-09-05 Tx date 2018-09-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: ROJAFI (11431872) (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+3,120,000 vol |
3,120,000 | |
Filed 2018-08-12 Tx date 2018-08-03 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-$400,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2018-07-27 Tx date 2015-10-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-70,000 vol |
183,000 | |
Filed 2018-07-27 Tx date 2015-10-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-125,000 vol |
||
Filed 2018-07-27 Tx date 2018-04-28 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-200,000 vol |
2,574,747 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2014-09-10 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
153,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-12-07 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-70,000 vol |
83,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-920,000 vol |
5,211,977 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-07-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,300,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Rapisarda, Paul Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-5,147,727 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-03-19 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-83,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-03-19 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-83,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-01-06 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-01-06 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-10-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-125,000 vol |
128,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-03-19 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-83,000 vol |
45,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-01-06 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
115,840 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-12-07 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-15,840 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2017-09-24 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-12-07 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-70,000 vol |
83,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-01-06 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
148,960 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-12-07 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-48,690 vol |
100,270 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-147,640 vol |
2,644,523 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2015-10-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-125,000 vol |
153,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-05 Tx date 2018-06-04 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds 7.25% Sr Secured Bonds
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+$3,000,000 vol |
$3,000,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-05 Tx date 2010-11-12 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds 7.25% Sr Secured Bonds
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-05-23 Tx date 2018-05-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Zebra Holdings and Investments S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+20,140,094 vol |
54,782,312 | |
Filed 2018-05-22 Tx date 2018-05-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+20,140,094 vol |
61,655,814 | |
Filed 2018-05-17 Tx date 2018-05-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-684,900 vol |
41,515,720 | |
Filed 2018-05-17 Tx date 2018-05-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-684,900 vol |
||
Filed 2018-05-15 Tx date 2018-05-15 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-684,900 vol |
41,515,720 | |
Filed 2017-10-27 Tx date 2017-10-23 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$5,700,000 vol |
$400,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-24 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
59 - Exercise for cash
|
-55,980 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-24 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-55,980 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-24 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
59 - Exercise for cash
|
-55,980 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-55,980 vol |
||
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-05 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,884
+6,500 vol $0.29 each |
18,819,082 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
59 - Exercise for cash
|
-55,980 vol |
1,015,909 | |
Filed 2017-01-18 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-18 Tx date 2009-09-10 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lundin, Ian Henrik
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,000,000 vol |
6,131,977 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2013-11-01 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-1,171,826 vol |
4,134,594 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
2,774,747 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-153,003 vol |
774,747 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2008-02-01 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Heppenstall, C. Ashley
4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2010-09-22 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Azrac, Aksel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
2,792,163 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-157,640 vol |
792,163 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+4,000,000 vol |
8,134,594 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-55,980 vol |
1,015,909 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,000,000 vol |
3,015,909 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Rapisarda, Paul Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,000,000 vol |
5,147,727 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
58 - Expiration of rights
|
-828,443 vol |
3,131,977 | |
Filed 2016-12-27 Tx date 2016-12-21 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lorito Holdings S.a.r.l.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Bonds
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$3,800,000 vol |
$6,100,000 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2013-11-01 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maria Teresa Soden (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-16 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maria Teresa Soden (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2016-05-18 Tx date 2016-05-16 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-100,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Salita, German
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,211,977 vol |
3,960,420 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Rapisarda, Paul Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,147,727 vol |
2,147,727 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-11-16 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Rapisarda, Paul Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Oravec, Martin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+840,909 vol |
1,071,889 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Northland, Marco
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,934,594 vol |
5,306,420 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Lacueva Canut, Christian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+574,747 vol |
927,750 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-09 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Alvarez-Bolado, Fernando
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSUs)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+592,163 vol |
949,803 | |
Filed 2015-11-20 Tx date 2015-11-18 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,684
+20,300 vol $0.28 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-20 Tx date 2015-11-17 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,269
+4,700 vol $0.27 each |
79,700 | |
Filed 2015-08-21 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$ETX
Etrion Corporation |
Soden, Garrett
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,400
+40,000 vol $0.31 each |
75,000 |