Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2017-04-03 Tx date 2017-03-31 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
830,908 | |
Filed 2016-09-30 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-142,500
-375,000 vol $0.38 each |
0 | |
Filed 2016-02-09 Tx date 2016-02-05 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,805
+9,500 vol $0.19 each |
1,645,000 | |
Filed 2016-02-09 Tx date 2016-02-09 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$877.50
+4,500 vol $0.195 each |
1,649,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-23 Tx date 2015-11-18 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,600
+30,000 vol $0.32 each |
1,635,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-13 Tx date 2015-10-13 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,474
+11,500 vol $0.3891 each |
780,908 | |
Filed 2015-08-31 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$321.60
+1,000 vol $0.3216 each |
768,908 | |
Filed 2015-08-31 Tx date 2015-08-28 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$160.80
+500 vol $0.3216 each |
769,408 | |
Filed 2015-07-20 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,000
+5,000 vol $0.40 each |
1,605,500 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,200
+10,000 vol $0.32 each |
767,908 | |
Filed 2015-07-17 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,000
+10,000 vol $0.30 each |
757,908 | |
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Hislop, Martin
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2014-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$150,000
+375,000 vol $0.40 each |
375,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$140,000
+350,000 vol $0.40 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2014-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
HARTZLER, CURTIS A.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
McLeod, John George Fergusson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
50,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-25,000
-500,000 vol $0.05 each |
283,676 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
1,360,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,600,500 | ||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Lore, Robyn Henry
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
350,000 | ||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,493 vol |
14,183 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
$-10,000
-500,000 vol $0.02 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-25,000
-500,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-135,000
-1,350,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,350,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,493 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$21,300
+53,250 vol $0.40 each |
53,250 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2007-10-17 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,841,668 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
forgeron, john alphonsus
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Compression West Corp (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-118,750 vol |
6,250 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
forgeron, john alphonsus
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
forgeron, john alphonsus
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Compression West Corp (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$50,000
+125,000 vol $0.40 each |
131,250 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
$-10,000
-500,000 vol $0.02 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
forgeron, john alphonsus
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,819,380 vol |
95,756 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
forgeron, john alphonsus
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-740,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Reeves, Scott Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-608,863 vol |
32,046 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-25,000
-500,000 vol $0.05 each |
283,676 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-135,000
-1,350,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,350,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
-1,026,324 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,493 vol |
-1,295,817 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2014-04-29 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$56,250
+225,000 vol $0.25 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2014-04-29 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-56,250
-225,000 vol $0.25 each |
1,310,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
1,360,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Shook, Ian Gerald
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$125,000
+2,500,000 vol $0.05 each |
14,958,154 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0294-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-14,210,246 vol |
747,908 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0391-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-12,809,578 vol |
674,188 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: FirstEnergy Capital Corp a/c FE1-0391-E (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$419,000
+1,047,500 vol $0.40 each |
1,721,688 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-695,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-07-02 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Reeves, Scott Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-989,167 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$80,000
+200,000 vol $0.40 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-750,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$50,000
+125,000 vol $0.40 each |
280,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$50,000
+125,000 vol $0.40 each |
155,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-570,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wade, Richard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-100,000
-2,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
600,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
1,810,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
-1,295,816 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-269,492 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,310,000 vol |
-1,026,324 | |
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,350,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
52 - Expiration of options
|
$-135,000
-1,350,000 vol $0.10 each |
||
Filed 2015-07-01 Tx date 2015-07-01 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Rousch, Wayne John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
$-10,000
-500,000 vol $0.02 each |
283,676 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Crosbie, Robert Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Crosbow Enterprises (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,375,000 vol |
125,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Perry, Bradford Ronald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Perry, Bradford Ronald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-550,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Perry, Bradford Ronald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Perry, Bradford Ronald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$20,000
+50,000 vol $0.40 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Laska, Timothy Mark
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Laska, Timothy Mark
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-700,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Laska, Timothy Mark
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
$30,000
+75,000 vol $0.40 each |
82,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Laska, Timothy Mark
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-133,000 vol |
7,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Crosbie, Robert Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-500,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Crosbie, Robert Stewart
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Crosbow Enterprises (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$50,000
+125,000 vol $0.40 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-30 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Laska, Timothy Mark
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$30,000
+75,000 vol $0.40 each |
157,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2014-01-08 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Perry, Bradford Ronald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-01 Tx date 2015-05-12 |
$FEN
Forent Energy Ltd. |
Wilson, W. Brett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-300,000 vol |
695,000 |