Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-06-06 11:41 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Reed, Vicki Sue
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-06 11:38 Tx date 2021-11-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Reed, Vicki Sue
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-06-02 12:04 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-02 12:03 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-06-01 09:18 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-06-01 22:03 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Medrano, Benjamin James
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
135,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 22:02 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Verbora, Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
150,001 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:59 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Côté, Stéphan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+2,500 vol |
77,500 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:58 Tx date 2021-11-04 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Côté, Stéphan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
75,000 | ||
Filed 2022-06-01 21:50 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Scharlach, Randall
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:50 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Scharlach, Randall
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-06-01 21:49 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Manhas, Amardeep
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
240,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:47 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
410,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:45 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Hewitt, Paula Amy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
163,888 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:44 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:42 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:41 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 21:39 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Jafferi, Mujeeb
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
110,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 09:24 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Wong, Donna Kar Yin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-01 09:18 Tx date 2022-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
560,000 | |
Filed 2022-05-09 13:28 Tx date 2022-05-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Verbora, Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
125,001 | ||
Filed 2021-07-05 15:03 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Lubman, Ellen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 15:02 Tx date 2021-06-07 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Lubman, Ellen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 15:01 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Fishman, Barry
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 14:59 Tx date 2021-06-07 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Fishman, Barry
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-06-30 17:28 Tx date 2021-06-07 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Lubman, Ellen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
200 | ||
Filed 2021-06-30 17:22 Tx date 2021-06-07 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Fishman, Barry
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2021-06-22 08:19 Tx date 2021-05-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
360,000 | |
Filed 2021-06-21 11:37 Tx date 2021-04-30 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. |
Hewitt, Paula Amy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+38,888 vol |
138,888 | |
Filed 2021-05-14 20:51 Tx date 2021-05-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Medrano, Benjamin James
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
110,000 | ||
Filed 2021-04-19 22:14 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Event Horizon (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+3,580,915 vol |
3,580,915 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 22:13 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Event Horizon (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-19 22:12 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: CRS Energy Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-3,580,915 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 22:06 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2828185 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+3,655,915 vol |
3,655,915 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 22:05 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2828185 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-19 22:04 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2423450 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-3,655,915 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 21:55 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Iron Taco Partnership (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+3,517,027 vol |
3,517,027 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 21:54 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Iron Taco Partnership (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-19 21:53 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Iron and Fuzz Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-3,517,027 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 21:49 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2622228 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+5,267,026 vol |
5,267,026 | |
Filed 2021-04-19 21:49 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2622228 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-04-19 21:48 Tx date 2021-04-16 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2360203 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-5,267,026 vol |
305,555 | |
Filed 2021-03-24 19:47 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-17 15:23 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-17 15:24 Tx date 2021-03-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$37,901
+5,831 vol $6.50 each |
11,662 | |
Filed 2021-03-17 15:23 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,831 | ||
Filed 2021-03-17 15:20 Tx date 2021-03-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Hewitt, Paula Amy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$23,705
+3,647 vol $6.50 each |
3,647 | |
Filed 2021-03-17 15:19 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Hewitt, Paula Amy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-17 15:13 Tx date 2021-03-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Wong, Donna Kar Yin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$50,004
+7,693 vol $6.50 each |
7,693 | |
Filed 2021-03-17 15:12 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Wong, Donna Kar Yin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-17 15:10 Tx date 2021-03-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$250,003
+38,462 vol $6.50 each |
38,462 | |
Filed 2021-03-16 14:21 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Manhas, Amardeep
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
55,555 | ||
Filed 2021-02-19 14:37 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Weinand, Dieter K.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,911 vol |
117,911 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:35 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Boudreau, Helen M.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,911 vol |
117,911 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:31 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:29 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-19 14:23 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Jafferi, Mujeeb
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:22 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Jafferi, Mujeeb
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-19 14:14 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:11 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-19 14:08 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 14:07 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-19 13:53 Tx date 2021-02-17 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-19 13:51 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-05 19:59 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2360203 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,777 vol |
27,777 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 19:58 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2360203 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-05 19:56 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2360203 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$249,997
+55,555 vol $4.50 each |
5,572,581 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 15:58 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Wong, Donna Kar Yin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 15:53 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Wong, Donna Kar Yin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-05 13:51 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,778 vol |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 13:27 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,777 vol |
27,777 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 13:27 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,777 vol |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 13:26 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$249,997
+55,555 vol $4.50 each |
55,555 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 13:26 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$249,997
+55,555 vol $4.50 each |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 13:22 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$250,002
+55,556 vol $4.50 each |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 11:53 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,778 vol |
27,778 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 11:53 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
+27,778 vol |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 11:51 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-05 11:51 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$250,002
+55,556 vol $4.50 each |
55,556 | |
Filed 2021-01-05 11:51 Tx date 2021-01-05 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$250,002
+55,556 vol $4.50 each |
||
Filed 2021-01-05 11:51 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-10-09 19:26 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Scharlach, Randall
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: Randall Scharlach Family Trust 2014 (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
105,555 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 18:22 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Manhas, Amardeep
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
215,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 18:11 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Boudreau, Helen M.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
100,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 18:00 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Jafferi, Mujeeb
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,622,582 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 17:25 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Hewitt, Paula Amy
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
100,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 16:29 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
del Moral, Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2360203 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,517,026 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 15:10 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Bryson, Nathan John
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 14:47 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Yermus, Ryan D.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2423450 Ontario Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,655,915 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 13:58 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Dyck, Tyler R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
120,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 13:16 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Levy, Ronan
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Iron and Fuzz Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,517,027 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 12:41 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Fleiman, Hannan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: CRS Energy Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,580,915 | ||
Filed 2020-10-09 11:57 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$FTRP
Field Trip Health Ltd. (formerly Newton Energy Corporation) |
Weinand, Dieter K.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
100,000 | ||
Filed 2020-10-05 15:57 Tx date 2015-01-15 |
$FTRP
Newton Energy Corporation |
BURSTALL, V.E. DALE
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Lost In Space, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Convertible Debentures
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$20,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2020-07-16 12:13 Tx date 2015-01-15 |
$FTRP
Newton Energy Corporation |
BURSTALL, V.E. DALE
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Lost In Space, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Convertible Debentures
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-$20,000 vol |