Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-09-02 14:11 Tx date 2022-08-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$8,000
+400,000 vol $0.02 each |
1,376,190 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 15:53 Tx date 2021-02-16 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$7,495
+499,667 vol $0.015 each |
499,667 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 15:52 Tx date 2021-02-16 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
schwarz, jayson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$7,494
+499,666 vol $0.015 each |
499,666 | |
Filed 2021-02-22 15:50 Tx date 2011-10-27 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
schwarz, jayson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-02-22 15:48 Tx date 2021-02-16 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$7,495
+499,667 vol $0.015 each |
||
Filed 2021-02-22 15:18 Tx date 2021-02-16 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$14,989
+999,333 vol $0.015 each |
||
Filed 2021-02-22 15:11 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-09-21 16:38 Tx date 2020-09-21 |
$GOP
Gourmet Ocean Products Inc. |
Dorin, George Graham
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,750
-175,000 vol $0.01 each |
0 | |
Filed 2020-02-05 17:03 Tx date 2018-12-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$10,000
+500,000 vol $0.02 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2020-02-05 17:02 Tx date 2019-12-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$9,999
+476,190 vol $0.021 each |
976,190 | |
Filed 2020-02-05 17:00 Tx date 2018-12-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$10,000
+500,000 vol $0.02 each |
||
Filed 2020-02-05 16:56 Tx date 2019-12-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,999
+476,190 vol $0.021 each |
476,190 | |
Filed 2020-02-05 16:56 Tx date 2019-12-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,999
+476,190 vol $0.021 each |
||
Filed 2020-02-05 16:54 Tx date 2016-04-26 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-01-06 21:05 Tx date 2019-12-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Ivanov, Volodymyr
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+750,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2020-01-06 20:53 Tx date 2019-11-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Ivanov, Volodymyr
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-11-10 20:42 Tx date 2019-11-08 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-6,125
-625,000 vol $0.0098 each |
0 | |
Filed 2018-09-06 Tx date 2018-09-05 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$38,752
+1,937,602 vol $0.02 each |
3,467,602 | |
Filed 2018-09-06 Tx date 2018-08-27 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$38,752
+1,937,602 vol $0.02 each |
3,400,602 | |
Filed 2018-07-11 Tx date 2018-07-09 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$12,500
+625,000 vol $0.02 each |
625,000 | |
Filed 2018-07-11 Tx date 2018-07-09 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+500,000 vol $0.02 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2018-07-06 Tx date 2018-06-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$375.00
+12,500 vol $0.03 each |
||
Filed 2018-07-06 Tx date 2018-06-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$375.00
+12,500 vol $0.03 each |
||
Filed 2018-07-04 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: JSA 2037 Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$5,000
+500,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-07-04 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: JSA 2037 Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$5,000
+250,000 vol $0.02 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-29 Tx date 2018-05-07 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-29 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-29 Tx date 2018-06-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-29 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2018-06-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2018-05-07 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-19 Tx date 2018-06-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-19 Tx date 2018-05-07 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
||
Filed 2018-06-14 Tx date 2018-06-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$375.00
+12,500 vol $0.03 each |
12,500 | |
Filed 2018-06-01 Tx date 2018-05-07 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$10,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.01 each |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-01 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Maclean Family Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-01 Tx date 2018-05-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: JSA 2037 Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$5,000
+500,000 vol $0.01 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-01 Tx date 2011-10-27 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: JSA 2037 Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-10-08 Tx date 2017-10-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-660.00
-66,000 vol $0.01 each |
0 | |
Filed 2017-10-05 Tx date 2017-10-04 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,800
-180,000 vol $0.01 each |
66,000 | |
Filed 2017-10-03 Tx date 2017-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,540
-154,000 vol $0.01 each |
396,000 | |
Filed 2017-10-03 Tx date 2017-10-02 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,500
-150,000 vol $0.01 each |
246,000 | |
Filed 2017-09-19 Tx date 2017-09-18 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,750
-250,000 vol $0.015 each |
550,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-22 Tx date 2017-08-22 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$265.00
+13,250 vol $0.02 each |
1,083,250 | |
Filed 2017-08-22 Tx date 2017-08-22 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$265.00
+13,250 vol $0.02 each |
1,083,250 | |
Filed 2017-08-22 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,962
+78,500 vol $0.025 each |
1,070,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-22 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,962
+78,500 vol $0.025 each |
1,070,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-07 Tx date 2017-08-03 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-12,180
-700,000 vol $0.0174 each |
800,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-26 Tx date 2017-07-25 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$75.00
+3,000 vol $0.025 each |
991,500 | |
Filed 2017-07-26 Tx date 2017-07-25 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$75.00
+3,000 vol $0.025 each |
991,500 | |
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-07-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$187.50
+7,500 vol $0.025 each |
988,500 | |
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-07-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$187.50
+7,500 vol $0.025 each |
988,500 | |
Filed 2017-07-18 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$375.00
+15,000 vol $0.025 each |
981,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-18 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$375.00
+15,000 vol $0.025 each |
981,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-07-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$62.50
+2,500 vol $0.025 each |
966,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-07-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$62.50
+2,500 vol $0.025 each |
966,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-27 Tx date 2017-06-26 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,250
+50,000 vol $0.025 each |
963,500 | |
Filed 2017-06-27 Tx date 2017-06-26 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,250
+50,000 vol $0.025 each |
963,500 | |
Filed 2017-06-19 Tx date 2017-06-19 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,250
+50,000 vol $0.025 each |
913,500 | |
Filed 2017-06-19 Tx date 2017-06-19 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,250
+50,000 vol $0.025 each |
913,500 | |
Filed 2017-06-14 Tx date 2017-06-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$350.00
+14,000 vol $0.025 each |
863,500 | |
Filed 2017-06-14 Tx date 2017-06-12 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$350.00
+14,000 vol $0.025 each |
863,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-25 Tx date 2017-05-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100.00
+4,000 vol $0.025 each |
849,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-25 Tx date 2017-05-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100.00
+4,000 vol $0.025 each |
849,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-21 Tx date 2017-05-18 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,937
+157,500 vol $0.025 each |
845,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-21 Tx date 2017-05-18 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,937
+157,500 vol $0.025 each |
845,500 | |
Filed 2017-05-11 Tx date 2017-05-09 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$312.50
+12,500 vol $0.025 each |
688,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-11 Tx date 2017-05-08 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$312.50
+12,500 vol $0.025 each |
688,000 | |
Filed 2017-04-21 Tx date 2017-04-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$75.00
+3,000 vol $0.025 each |
675,500 | |
Filed 2017-04-21 Tx date 2017-04-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$75.00
+3,000 vol $0.025 each |
675,500 | |
Filed 2017-04-07 Tx date 2017-04-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37.50
+1,500 vol $0.025 each |
672,500 | |
Filed 2017-04-07 Tx date 2017-04-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37.50
+1,500 vol $0.025 each |
672,500 | |
Filed 2017-04-05 Tx date 2017-04-05 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,637
+65,500 vol $0.025 each |
671,000 | |
Filed 2017-04-05 Tx date 2017-04-05 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,637
+65,500 vol $0.025 each |
671,000 | |
Filed 2017-03-23 Tx date 2017-03-16 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,000
+800,000 vol $0.03 each |
1,500,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-25 Tx date 2017-01-24 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$250.00
+10,000 vol $0.025 each |
605,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-25 Tx date 2017-01-24 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$250.00
+10,000 vol $0.025 each |
605,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12.50
+500 vol $0.025 each |
595,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$25.00
+1,000 vol $0.025 each |
||
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,937
+157,500 vol $0.025 each |
595,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12.50
+500 vol $0.025 each |
595,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$25.00
+1,000 vol $0.025 each |
||
Filed 2017-01-23 Tx date 2017-01-23 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,937
+157,500 vol $0.025 each |
595,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-21 Tx date 2017-01-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$687.50
+27,500 vol $0.025 each |
437,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-21 Tx date 2017-01-20 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$687.50
+27,500 vol $0.025 each |
437,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-19 Tx date 2017-01-17 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$562.50
+22,500 vol $0.025 each |
410,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-19 Tx date 2017-01-17 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$562.50
+22,500 vol $0.025 each |
410,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2017-01-11 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$17.50
+500 vol $0.035 each |
387,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2017-01-11 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$17.50
+500 vol $0.035 each |
387,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-06 Tx date 2017-01-05 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$870.00
+29,000 vol $0.03 each |
387,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-05 Tx date 2017-01-05 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$870.00
+29,000 vol $0.03 each |
387,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2016-12-14 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,370
+358,000 vol $0.015 each |
358,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: JAKS CONSTRUCTION LTD (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2016-12-14 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,370
+358,000 vol $0.015 each |
358,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-15 Tx date 2011-10-27 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Jaks Construction Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-10-06 Tx date 2016-10-03 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Rudensky, Wally
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+712,500 vol |
712,500 | |
Filed 2016-10-06 Tx date 2012-06-06 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Rudensky, Wally
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2013-09-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-62,500 vol |
-62,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2013-09-30 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+62,500 vol |
||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-250,000 vol |
||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Tanoh, Augustus Obuadum
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$57,000
+712,500 vol $0.08 each |
712,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+962,500 vol |
962,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Tanoh, Augustus Obuadum
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Tanoh, Augustus Obuadum
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Tanoh, Augustus Obuadum
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2011-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Tanoh, Augustus Obuadum
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-62,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+962,500 vol |
962,500 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-09-29 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Schwarz, Jayson Brian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-1,400,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-09-29 Tx date 2016-08-15 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Welner, Heather Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-250,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-04-29 Tx date 2016-04-26 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$20,000
+250,000 vol $0.08 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-29 Tx date 2016-04-26 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Norval, Graeme William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-17 Tx date 2016-04-04 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$45,500
+700,000 vol $0.065 each |
700,000 | |
Filed 2016-04-17 Tx date 2016-03-17 |
$GOP
Organic Potash Corporation |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|