Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-06-21 16:22 Tx date 2024-06-20 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,850
+5,000 vol $1.37 each |
1,560,566 | |
Filed 2024-05-29 16:17 Tx date 2024-05-28 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$32,000
+20,000 vol $1.60 each |
235,545 | |
Filed 2024-05-29 16:16 Tx date 2024-05-27 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
47 - Acquisition or disposition by gift
|
$-32,200
-20,000 vol $1.61 each |
215,545 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 20:06 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$24,000
+15,000 vol $1.60 each |
50,400 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 20:04 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
McEwen, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$50,000
+31,250 vol $1.60 each |
31,250 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 20:02 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$48,000
+30,000 vol $1.60 each |
199,199 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 20:01 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Williams, Gregory Denton
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$20,000
+12,500 vol $1.60 each |
12,500 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 19:59 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$20,000
+12,500 vol $1.60 each |
46,500 | |
Filed 2024-05-27 19:57 Tx date 2024-05-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$68,480
+42,800 vol $1.60 each |
1,555,566 | |
Filed 2024-04-02 09:52 Tx date 2024-03-28 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$14,790
+8,500 vol $1.74 each |
35,400 | |
Filed 2024-04-02 09:51 Tx date 2024-03-28 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,565
+1,500 vol $1.71 each |
26,900 | |
Filed 2024-04-01 11:12 Tx date 2024-03-28 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$13,333
+7,500 vol $1.78 each |
1,512,766 | |
Filed 2023-08-18 13:29 Tx date 2023-08-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,198
+10,000 vol $0.62 each |
1,505,266 | |
Filed 2023-07-17 19:17 Tx date 2022-07-01 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Kaiser, Gerard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
380,000 | ||
Filed 2023-07-17 19:17 Tx date 2022-07-01 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Kaiser, Gerard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
47,500 | ||
Filed 2023-07-03 21:55 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$14,762
+25,000 vol $0.59 each |
1,495,266 | |
Filed 2023-06-28 14:22 Tx date 2023-06-27 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Williams, Gregory Denton
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Unit
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-06-28 14:22 Tx date 2023-06-27 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Williams, Gregory Denton
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-06-28 14:22 Tx date 2023-06-27 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Williams, Gregory Denton
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-04-03 13:38 Tx date 2023-03-31 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$14,000
+25,000 vol $0.56 each |
1,470,266 | |
Filed 2023-03-31 13:11 Tx date 2023-03-31 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$26,950
+35,000 vol $0.77 each |
235,545 | |
Filed 2023-03-31 13:09 Tx date 2023-03-30 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$37,500
+50,000 vol $0.75 each |
1,445,266 | |
Filed 2023-03-31 13:07 Tx date 2023-03-30 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,000
+12,000 vol $0.75 each |
34,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-27 12:43 Tx date 2022-12-22 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,400
+10,000 vol $0.74 each |
25,400 | |
Filed 2022-12-22 09:41 Tx date 2022-12-21 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$13,540
+25,000 vol $0.54 each |
1,395,266 | |
Filed 2022-12-21 15:45 Tx date 2022-12-21 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,650
+5,000 vol $0.73 each |
22,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-21 15:45 Tx date 2022-12-20 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,650
+5,000 vol $0.73 each |
17,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-15 16:27 Tx date 2022-12-15 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,700
+5,000 vol $0.54 each |
169,199 | |
Filed 2022-12-13 13:49 Tx date 2022-12-13 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$29,200
+40,000 vol $0.73 each |
200,545 | |
Filed 2022-12-13 13:49 Tx date 2022-12-13 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,300
+10,000 vol $0.73 each |
160,545 | |
Filed 2022-12-07 17:13 Tx date 2022-12-06 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$32,185
+50,000 vol $0.64 each |
1,370,266 | |
Filed 2022-11-15 15:05 Tx date 2022-11-14 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,805
+11,200 vol $0.88 each |
15,400 | |
Filed 2022-11-14 12:19 Tx date 2022-11-11 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$42,500
+50,000 vol $0.85 each |
150,545 | |
Filed 2022-10-03 12:15 Tx date 2022-09-30 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$13,567
+10,000 vol $1.36 each |
1,320,266 | |
Filed 2022-07-06 20:00 Tx date 2022-05-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,040
+4,200 vol $1.20 each |
4,200 | |
Filed 2022-07-04 10:53 Tx date 2022-06-30 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,369
+5,000 vol $1.27 each |
1,310,266 | |
Filed 2022-06-03 13:20 Tx date 2022-06-02 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$24,988
+20,000 vol $1.25 each |
1,305,266 | |
Filed 2022-03-29 17:25 Tx date 2022-03-25 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,741
+5,000 vol $1.15 each |
317,258 | |
Filed 2022-03-29 11:33 Tx date 2022-03-25 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,643
+5,400 vol $1.42 each |
12,000 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:10 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,452 vol |
134,502 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:09 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+117,363 vol |
523,563 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:07 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Harvey II, Francis Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,452 vol |
134,502 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:05 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Hodge Jr, Hugo Vincent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+43,193 vol |
246,293 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:03 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
McEwen, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,452 vol |
48,452 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:01 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+80,714 vol |
437,864 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 13:00 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+80,714 vol |
465,763 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 12:58 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+239,088 vol |
1,391,637 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 12:56 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+17,452 vol |
60,641 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 12:55 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+177,135 vol |
1,044,573 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 12:51 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+74,074 vol |
74,074 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 12:51 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Unit
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-74,074 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-03-25 11:36 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,650
+7,500 vol $1.42 each |
1,285,266 | |
Filed 2022-03-25 11:35 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,256
+1,600 vol $1.41 each |
1,277,766 | |
Filed 2022-03-25 11:34 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,251
+900 vol $1.39 each |
1,276,166 | |
Filed 2022-03-24 18:37 Tx date 2022-03-24 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,925
+7,000 vol $1.42 each |
100,545 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:48 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+15,500 vol |
117,050 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:46 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+31,000 vol |
43,189 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:44 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+238,600 vol |
1,152,549 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:42 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+80,400 vol |
385,049 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:40 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+52,500 vol |
357,150 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:38 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
McEwen, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+31,000 vol |
31,000 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:36 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Harvey II, Francis Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+15,500 vol |
117,050 | |
Filed 2022-03-22 14:33 Tx date 2021-11-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+176,900 vol |
867,438 | |
Filed 2021-12-27 21:52 Tx date 2021-12-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,600
+2,500 vol $1.84 each |
1,275,266 | |
Filed 2021-12-27 21:52 Tx date 2021-12-23 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$925.00
+500 vol $1.85 each |
1,272,766 | |
Filed 2021-12-20 12:43 Tx date 2021-12-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$133.96
+90 vol $1.49 each |
164,199 | |
Filed 2021-12-09 14:24 Tx date 2021-12-08 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,667
+6,400 vol $1.51 each |
164,109 | |
Filed 2021-12-06 14:08 Tx date 2021-12-02 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,737
+900 vol $1.93 each |
1,272,266 | |
Filed 2021-12-06 14:07 Tx date 2021-12-02 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,276
+1,800 vol $1.82 each |
1,271,366 | |
Filed 2021-12-06 14:07 Tx date 2021-12-02 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$543.00
+300 vol $1.81 each |
1,269,566 | |
Filed 2021-09-22 15:43 Tx date 2021-09-21 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,150
+500 vol $2.30 each |
1,269,266 | |
Filed 2021-09-20 22:09 Tx date 2021-09-16 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,911
+1,000 vol $1.91 each |
312,258 | |
Filed 2021-09-20 22:09 Tx date 2021-09-15 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,739
+1,000 vol $1.74 each |
311,258 | |
Filed 2021-09-20 21:36 Tx date 2021-09-17 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,300
+1,000 vol $2.30 each |
1,268,766 | |
Filed 2021-09-20 21:36 Tx date 2021-09-16 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,210
+500 vol $2.42 each |
1,267,766 | |
Filed 2021-09-17 12:00 Tx date 2021-09-14 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,743
+1,000 vol $1.74 each |
310,258 | |
Filed 2021-09-14 13:27 Tx date 2021-09-13 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,540
+700 vol $2.20 each |
1,267,266 | |
Filed 2021-09-14 13:27 Tx date 2021-09-13 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$657.00
+300 vol $2.19 each |
1,266,566 | |
Filed 2021-09-10 17:53 Tx date 2021-09-10 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,782
+2,600 vol $2.22 each |
93,545 | |
Filed 2021-09-09 16:40 Tx date 2021-09-09 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,728
+5,000 vol $2.15 each |
90,945 | |
Filed 2021-09-09 10:44 Tx date 2021-09-08 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$210.00
+100 vol $2.10 each |
1,266,266 | |
Filed 2021-09-09 10:43 Tx date 2021-09-08 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$812.00
+400 vol $2.03 each |
1,266,166 | |
Filed 2021-09-09 10:43 Tx date 2021-09-08 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,090
+1,000 vol $2.09 each |
1,265,766 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 14:56 Tx date 2021-05-26 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,160
+4,000 vol $2.54 each |
1,264,766 | |
Filed 2021-05-26 14:55 Tx date 2021-05-26 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,520
+1,000 vol $2.52 each |
1,260,766 | |
Filed 2021-05-21 21:54 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
913,949 | ||
Filed 2021-05-21 21:54 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Londa, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,259,766 | ||
Filed 2021-05-21 17:48 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
McEwen, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-21 17:48 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
McEwen, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-21 17:46 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
406,200 | ||
Filed 2021-05-21 17:46 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Reznik, George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
6,600 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:18 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Unit
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
74,074 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:18 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
304,650 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:17 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Grandis, Michael Howard
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:14 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
304,649 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:13 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Julian, Michael Joseph
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
157,709 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:09 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Hodge Jr, Hugo Vincent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
203,100 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:09 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Hodge Jr, Hugo Vincent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
44,964 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:04 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
690,538 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 15:04 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
O'Leary, Dermot David
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
309,258 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:57 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Harvey II, Francis Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
101,550 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:57 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Harvey II, Francis Joseph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
153,169 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:32 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
12,189 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:31 Tx date 2021-05-19 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$65,510
+25,000 vol $2.62 each |
85,945 | |
Filed 2021-05-20 14:30 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Liston, Thomas Craig
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
60,945 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:12 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
101,550 | ||
Filed 2021-05-20 14:11 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$GRID
Tantalus Systems Holding Inc. (formerly RiseTech Capital Corp.) |
Formusa, Laura Mary
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|