Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2019-03-04 Tx date 2019-03-01 |
$IEX
City View Green Holdings Inc. |
Quinsam Capital Corporation
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
26,083,336 | ||
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-28 |
$IEX
City View Green Holdings Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+10,040,000 vol |
11,536,263 | |
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-28 |
$IEX
City View Green Holdings Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$300,000
+1,200,000 vol $0.25 each |
2,076,921 | |
Filed 2019-02-28 Tx date 2019-02-28 |
$IEX
City View Green Holdings Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$450,000
+600,000 vol $0.75 each |
2,676,921 | |
Filed 2019-02-27 Tx date 2019-02-27 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
McNeill, Stephen William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
$-36,000
-120,000 vol $0.30 each |
480,000 | |
Filed 2019-02-27 Tx date 2019-02-27 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-219,230 vol |
876,921 | |
Filed 2019-02-26 Tx date 2019-02-26 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-374,066 vol |
1,496,263 | |
Filed 2018-12-21 Tx date 2018-12-17 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$46,875
+312,500 vol $0.15 each |
4,613,312 | |
Filed 2018-12-21 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
312,500 | ||
Filed 2018-12-21 Tx date 2018-12-17 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$-46,875
-312,500 vol $0.15 each |
0 | |
Filed 2018-06-22 Tx date 2018-01-09 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
McNeill, Stephen William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
600,000 | ||
Filed 2018-01-15 Tx date 2018-01-09 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$240,000
+800,000 vol $0.30 each |
1,341,583 | |
Filed 2018-01-10 Tx date 2018-01-09 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$197,400
+658,000 vol $0.30 each |
1,096,151 | |
Filed 2017-12-27 Tx date 2017-12-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-18,200
-91,000 vol $0.20 each |
4,300,812 | |
Filed 2017-12-27 Tx date 2017-12-20 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-7,740
-36,000 vol $0.215 each |
4,471,812 | |
Filed 2017-12-27 Tx date 2017-12-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-16,800
-80,000 vol $0.21 each |
4,391,812 | |
Filed 2017-12-20 Tx date 2017-12-18 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$52,000
+650,000 vol $0.08 each |
||
Filed 2017-12-20 Tx date 2017-12-18 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$50,000
+625,000 vol $0.08 each |
4,507,812 | |
Filed 2017-12-06 Tx date 2017-12-06 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-332,000 vol |
2,635,967 | |
Filed 2017-09-14 Tx date 2017-09-08 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,700
+20,000 vol $0.085 each |
3,882,812 | |
Filed 2017-08-25 Tx date 2017-08-23 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-12,900
-215,000 vol $0.06 each |
3,862,812 | |
Filed 2017-08-08 Tx date 2017-08-04 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$15,000
+300,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,870,329 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-08-03 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$15,000
+300,000 vol $0.05 each |
4,077,812 | |
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
300,000 | ||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$960.00
+32,000 vol $0.03 each |
||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$960.00
+32,000 vol $0.03 each |
||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$960.00
+32,000 vol $0.03 each |
||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$960.00
+32,000 vol $0.03 each |
332,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2017-07-19 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$131,798
+2,635,967 vol $0.05 each |
2,967,967 | |
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-07-20 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-04-25 Tx date 2017-04-25 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$97,680
+1,953,602 vol $0.05 each |
3,777,812 | |
Filed 2017-04-25 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$7,500
+150,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2017-04-25 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,500
+150,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2017-04-25 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$7,500
+150,000 vol $0.05 each |
449,908 | |
Filed 2017-04-24 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,620
+92,405 vol $0.05 each |
438,151 | |
Filed 2017-04-23 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$7,500
+150,000 vol $0.05 each |
541,583 | |
Filed 2017-04-13 Tx date 2017-04-12 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Heng, Joseph, Ching-Hiang
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$73,516
+1,470,329 vol $0.05 each |
1,570,329 | |
Filed 2017-01-16 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$960.00
+32,000 vol $0.03 each |
32,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-16 Tx date 2014-11-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Gamble, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-01-14 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$125.00
+5,000 vol $0.025 each |
1,824,210 | |
Filed 2017-01-14 Tx date 2017-01-09 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$500.00
+25,000 vol $0.02 each |
1,819,210 | |
Filed 2016-10-03 Tx date 2016-10-03 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,500
-100,000 vol $0.015 each |
1,794,210 | |
Filed 2015-05-26 Tx date 2015-05-26 |
$IEX
Icon Exploration Inc. |
Fia, Roberto
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+259,910 vol |
2,044,210 |