Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-07-16 18:28 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Barton, Sheri
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,083,334 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:27 Tx date 2016-04-07 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Barton, Sheri
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
6,434,387 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:18 Tx date 2020-11-01 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
hadley, mark
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,400,430 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:17 Tx date 2020-11-01 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
hadley, mark
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,359,389 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:11 Tx date 2020-11-01 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Schafer, Ian Patrick
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,095,904 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:10 Tx date 2020-11-01 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Schafer, Ian Patrick
7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
6,622,006 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:06 Tx date 2023-04-03 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Dranchuk, Jason Brent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,655,540 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:05 Tx date 2023-04-03 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Dranchuk, Jason Brent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
200,000 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:01 Tx date 2018-03-30 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Carson, Neill
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 18:00 Tx date 2018-03-30 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Carson, Neill
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
7,666,111 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:57 Tx date 2019-09-13 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Beal, Linda Janice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
183,334 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:56 Tx date 2019-09-13 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Beal, Linda Janice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,305,493 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:53 Tx date 2022-12-19 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Heath, Ryan John McColl
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,857,386 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:52 Tx date 2022-12-19 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Heath, Ryan John McColl
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,483,945 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:48 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Ames, Richard Millington
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:47 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Ames, Richard Millington
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,539,723 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:21 Tx date 2020-12-08 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
FESTIVAL, JOHN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:20 Tx date 2020-12-08 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
FESTIVAL, JOHN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
3,072,360 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:18 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Shafiq, Majid
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,636,724 | ||
Filed 2024-07-16 17:08 Tx date 2017-07-18 |
$ITE
i3 Energy plc |
Shafiq, Majid
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
10,071,900 |