Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-05-03 16:46 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Wellington Star Consulting Ltd (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+60,000 vol |
60,000 | |
Filed 2024-05-03 16:44 Tx date 2023-12-27 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Wellington Star Consulting Ltd (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-05-03 16:42 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Wellington Star Consulting Ltd (Control or Direction)
|
Rights
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-60,000 vol |
90,000 | |
Filed 2024-05-03 16:39 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-60,000 vol |
||
Filed 2024-05-03 16:36 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-60,000 vol |
||
Filed 2024-04-30 18:21 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+90,000 vol |
90,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-30 18:19 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-04-30 18:18 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-90,000 vol |
135,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-30 18:08 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+90,000 vol |
591,375 | |
Filed 2024-04-30 18:08 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-90,000 vol |
135,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-30 18:03 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+90,000 vol |
541,500 | |
Filed 2024-04-30 18:01 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-90,000 vol |
135,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-01 12:05 Tx date 2024-03-25 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Wellington Star Consulting Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-01 12:02 Tx date 2023-12-27 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Wellington Star Consulting Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-04-01 11:56 Tx date 2023-12-27 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Aalderink, Dennis Wellington
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-29 23:38 Tx date 2024-03-25 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+225,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2024-03-29 23:36 Tx date 2019-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-29 23:28 Tx date 2024-03-25 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+225,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2024-03-29 23:26 Tx date 2021-03-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-29 23:21 Tx date 2024-03-25 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+225,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2024-03-29 23:19 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted share units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-01-24 22:09 Tx date 2024-01-23 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,871.875
-154,875 vol $0.025 each |
451,500 | |
Filed 2023-12-27 15:11 Tx date 2023-12-20 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-62,500 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-04 12:26 Tx date 2023-11-14 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$13,250
+265,000 vol $0.05 each |
265,000 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:55 Tx date 2023-06-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-187,500 vol |
362,500 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:53 Tx date 2023-11-14 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$22,575
+451,500 vol $0.05 each |
606,375 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:51 Tx date 2023-06-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-464,625 vol |
154,875 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:28 Tx date 2023-06-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-187,500 vol |
62,500 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:24 Tx date 2023-11-14 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$21,525
+430,500 vol $0.05 each |
501,375 | |
Filed 2023-12-01 15:23 Tx date 2023-06-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-212,625 vol |
70,875 | |
Filed 2023-09-21 13:50 Tx date 2023-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-250,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2023-09-19 13:45 Tx date 2023-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-50,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-26 14:26 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$12,350
+247,000 vol $0.05 each |
247,000 | |
Filed 2023-06-26 14:26 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$12,350
+247,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2023-03-08 15:34 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$14,175
+283,500 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2023-05-31 15:34 Tx date 2023-05-26 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-6,175
-247,000 vol $0.025 each |
36,500 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 17:13 Tx date 2020-07-10 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-03-08 17:11 Tx date 2021-12-20 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
450,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:27 Tx date 2022-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:26 Tx date 2021-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:25 Tx date 2019-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-03-08 16:24 Tx date 2022-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-03-08 16:23 Tx date 2022-07-10 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:22 Tx date 2020-07-10 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:22 Tx date 2020-07-10 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
||
Filed 2023-03-08 16:14 Tx date 2021-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-100,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 16:00 Tx date 2019-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:53 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$14,175
+283,500 vol $0.05 each |
283,500 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:53 Tx date 2019-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1138362 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-03-08 15:34 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$14,175
+283,500 vol $0.05 each |
283,500 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:32 Tx date 2020-11-26 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1277872 BC Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-03-08 15:30 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
400,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:28 Tx date 2022-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:26 Tx date 2021-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2023-03-08 15:26 Tx date 2020-11-26 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Niu, Alson
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-17 14:06 Tx date 2021-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-10-10 19:53 Tx date 2021-12-20 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2022-10-10 19:51 Tx date 2022-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-200,000 vol |
550,000 | |
Filed 2022-10-10 19:47 Tx date 2022-09-29 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
$30,975
+619,500 vol $0.05 each |
619,500 | |
Filed 2022-10-10 19:36 Tx date 2021-03-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Vessel Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-20 13:36 Tx date 2021-12-20 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-20 13:34 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Winter Point Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-18 15:26 Tx date 2021-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-18 15:24 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-18 15:23 Tx date 2021-03-09 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Vatanchi, Nader
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-17 14:06 Tx date 2021-04-01 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 14:05 Tx date 2020-07-10 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 14:03 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 14:02 Tx date 2019-04-03 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Pezzente, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-17 13:42 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 13:41 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-08-17 13:40 Tx date 2021-08-13 |
$MUSK
Musk Metals Corp. |
Sewell, Emily Christine
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|