Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2020-12-15 09:58 Tx date 2020-12-11 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Tata Steel Global Minerals Holdings Pte Ltd
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-47,169,226 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-10-19 18:03 Tx date 2020-02-26 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Molin Holdings Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+960,886 vol |
1,836,486 | |
Filed 2020-10-19 17:40 Tx date 2020-02-25 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Amanda Owen (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+82,933 vol |
282,553 | |
Filed 2020-10-19 15:53 Tx date 2020-10-19 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Molin Holdings Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$155,000
+1,000,000 vol $0.155 each |
2,187,600 | |
Filed 2020-10-19 11:45 Tx date 2020-10-16 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$34,335
+327,000 vol $0.105 each |
1,042,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-17 09:45 Tx date 2020-10-14 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,070
+23,000 vol $0.09 each |
715,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-17 09:44 Tx date 2020-10-13 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+100,000 vol $0.10 each |
692,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-16 12:20 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Molin Holdings Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$24,960
+312,000 vol $0.08 each |
1,187,600 | |
Filed 2020-10-13 16:06 Tx date 2020-10-09 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$800.00
+10,000 vol $0.08 each |
592,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 16:23 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,560
+82,000 vol $0.08 each |
582,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 16:22 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,400
+230,000 vol $0.08 each |
500,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 16:22 Tx date 2020-09-30 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$21,600
+270,000 vol $0.08 each |
270,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 16:21 Tx date 2015-11-15 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Caron, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-10-02 10:10 Tx date 2020-10-02 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,600
+120,000 vol $0.08 each |
462,192 | |
Filed 2020-09-26 16:13 Tx date 2020-09-25 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1680897 Ont (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+377,808 vol |
377,808 | |
Filed 2020-09-26 16:12 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1680897 Ont (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-09-26 16:07 Tx date 2020-09-25 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Sandra Leckie (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-1,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-09-26 16:07 Tx date 2020-09-25 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Robert Leckie (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-2,400 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-09-26 16:04 Tx date 2020-09-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+39,746 vol |
342,192 | |
Filed 2020-09-26 16:01 Tx date 2020-09-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,482
+123,328 vol $0.085 each |
302,446 | |
Filed 2019-01-11 Tx date 2019-01-09 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Boisjoli, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Estate Olga Pollock (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,000
+200,000 vol $0.06 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-01-11 Tx date 2018-11-06 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Boisjoli, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Estate Olga Pollock (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-12-19 Tx date 2018-12-14 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,530
+34,000 vol $0.045 each |
1,234,000 | |
Filed 2018-12-19 Tx date 2018-12-17 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,470
+166,000 vol $0.045 each |
1,400,000 | |
Filed 2018-12-17 Tx date 2018-11-30 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+200,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2018-12-17 Tx date 2018-11-30 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+200,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2018-12-05 Tx date 2018-11-30 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+200,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,100,000 | |
Filed 2018-08-21 Tx date 2018-08-17 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Sandra Leckie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-118,828 vol |
||
Filed 2018-08-21 Tx date 2018-08-17 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Sandra Leckie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-120,428 vol |
3,400 | |
Filed 2018-08-21 Tx date 2018-08-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Sandra Leckie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-2,400 vol |
1,000 | |
Filed 2018-08-21 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Robert Leckie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,400 | ||
Filed 2018-01-08 Tx date 2017-07-27 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Hudson, Roy Harry
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-150,000 vol |
445,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-06-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
925,000 | ||
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-06-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 6333621 Canada Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
900,000 | ||
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-06-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
560,000 | ||
Filed 2017-07-13 Tx date 2017-06-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,412,538 | ||
Filed 2017-02-24 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Molin Holdings Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-5,464.8919
-17,443 vol $0.3133 each |
875,600 | |
Filed 2017-02-24 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Amanda Owen (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,221.87
-3,900 vol $0.3133 each |
199,620 | |
Filed 2017-02-24 Tx date 2017-02-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Alison Owen in trust for Zoe Owen (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-9,604.8381
-30,657 vol $0.3133 each |
0 | |
Filed 2016-06-29 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Molin Holdings Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
893,043 | ||
Filed 2016-06-29 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Amanda Owen (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
203,520 | ||
Filed 2016-06-29 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Owen, Daniel
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Alison Owen in trust for Zoe Owen (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
30,657 | ||
Filed 2016-06-28 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Sandra Leckie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
123,828 | ||
Filed 2016-06-28 Tx date 2016-06-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Leckie, William Scott
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
179,118 | ||
Filed 2016-02-05 Tx date 2016-02-01 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,000
+200,000 vol $0.06 each |
760,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-29 Tx date 2015-12-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Martin, Robert Alexander
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-990.00
-18,000 vol $0.055 each |
1,011,719 | |
Filed 2015-07-30 Tx date 2015-07-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,300
+33,000 vol $0.10 each |
560,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-30 Tx date 2015-07-23 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,365
+67,000 vol $0.095 each |
527,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-24 Tx date 2015-07-22 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+100,000 vol $0.10 each |
460,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-24 Tx date 2015-07-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,465
+31,500 vol $0.11 each |
360,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-24 Tx date 2015-07-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,500
+15,000 vol $0.10 each |
328,500 | |
Filed 2015-07-24 Tx date 2015-07-21 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,617
+53,500 vol $0.105 each |
313,500 | |
Filed 2015-07-20 Tx date 2015-07-16 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,240
+88,000 vol $0.105 each |
260,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-20 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$NML
New Millennium Iron Corp. |
Journeaux, Howaith Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 1301738 Ontarion Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,260
+12,000 vol $0.105 each |
172,000 |