Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-12-20 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,960
+20,000 vol $0.248 each |
364,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-20 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$263.40
+1,000 vol $0.2634 each |
335,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-20 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$272.60
+1,000 vol $0.2726 each |
334,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-20 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,518
+6,000 vol $0.2531 each |
344,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-20 Tx date 2016-12-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$835.50
+3,000 vol $0.2785 each |
338,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-19 Tx date 2016-12-14 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,471
+10,000 vol $0.2471 each |
333,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-09 Tx date 2016-12-08 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$42,115
+168,462 vol $0.25 each |
3,091,265 | |
Filed 2016-12-09 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100,319
+401,279 vol $0.25 each |
2,922,803 | |
Filed 2016-12-08 Tx date 2016-12-06 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Baker Investments, LLC (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-22,500
-90,000 vol $0.25 each |
1,249,098 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+20,000 vol |
323,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Wolf, Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$570.00
+3,000 vol $0.19 each |
71,525 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Wolf, Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+23,125 vol |
68,525 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+36,000 vol |
2,521,524 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Patton, Troy C.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+30,000 vol |
66,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+28,000 vol |
136,537 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+36,000 vol |
128,441 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Ellis III, Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+30,000 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-05 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+26,875 vol |
146,758 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
2,485,524 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Wolf, Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
45,400 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
119,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
524,912 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Ellis III, Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
45,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
303,883 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Larson, Eric
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
68,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
92,441 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-28 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$6,000
+30,000 vol $0.20 each |
108,537 | |
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-10-17 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Morris, June M.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-12-02 Tx date 2016-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Morris, June M.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2016-11-29 Tx date 2016-11-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,295
+7,000 vol $0.185 each |
19,840 | |
Filed 2016-11-29 Tx date 2016-11-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$22,375
+89,500 vol $0.25 each |
112,840 | |
Filed 2016-11-29 Tx date 2016-11-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$857.50
+3,500 vol $0.245 each |
23,340 | |
Filed 2016-10-28 Tx date 2016-09-14 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Larson, Eric
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
18,000 | ||
Filed 2016-04-13 Tx date 2016-02-10 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
+1,139,533 vol |
2,455,524 | |
Filed 2016-04-13 Tx date 2016-02-10 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Allen & Company LLC (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
90 - Change in the nature of ownership
|
-1,139,533 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2016-04-06 Tx date 2016-02-10 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Allen & Company LLC
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-3,799,376 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-12-29 Tx date 2014-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Allen & Company LLC
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Voting Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-2,400,162 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-12-29 Tx date 2014-11-30 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Allen & Company LLC
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+2,400,162 vol |
4,399,376 | |
Filed 2015-12-29 Tx date 2015-12-29 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Allen & Company LLC
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-120,000
-600,000 vol $0.20 each |
3,799,376 | |
Filed 2015-08-28 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Wolf, Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
15,400 | |
Filed 2015-08-28 Tx date 2015-07-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Wolf, Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400 | ||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+81,691 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Baker, Marcus
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+74,883 vol |
89,883 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Ellis III, Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Ellis III, Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
228,500 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+45,383 vol |
273,883 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+37,441 vol |
62,441 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,061
+9,500 vol $0.64 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,061
+9,500 vol $0.64 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-06-02 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,005
+1,500 vol $0.67 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-06-02 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,005
+1,500 vol $0.67 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+63,537 vol |
78,537 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$429,721
+972,000 vol $0.4421 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$429,721
+972,000 vol $0.4421 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$429,721
+972,000 vol $0.4421 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$429,721
+972,000 vol $0.4421 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-21 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$429,721
+972,000 vol $0.4421 each |
1,219,300 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+81,691 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+81,691 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+15,000 vol |
1,234,300 | |
Filed 2015-08-26 Tx date 2015-08-25 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+81,691 vol |
1,315,991 | |
Filed 2015-08-24 Tx date 2015-08-19 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Mark, Elliot J.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
331,803 | |
Filed 2015-08-24 Tx date 2015-08-19 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Willey, Lawrence Donald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+12,000 vol |
132,000 | |
Filed 2015-08-24 Tx date 2015-08-19 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Patton, Troy C.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
807,007 | |
Filed 2015-08-24 Tx date 2015-08-19 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lynch, Jonathan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+15,000 vol |
274,701 | |
Filed 2015-08-24 Tx date 2015-08-19 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+30,000 vol |
324,912 | |
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lynch, Jonathan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-19 Tx date 2015-06-15 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lynch, Jonathan
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$757.20
+1,000 vol $0.76 each |
1,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2015-06-12 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$157,306
+213,500 vol $0.74 each |
213,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Hokin, Richard Neal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-10 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-10 Tx date 2015-06-09 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Simon, John
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$176,671
+247,300 vol $0.71 each |
247,300 | |
Filed 2015-06-05 Tx date 2015-06-02 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Caldwell, Ciel R.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,230
+8,050 vol $0.77 each |
12,840 | |
Filed 2015-06-04 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Robert L. Lentz Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-04 Tx date 2015-06-03 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Patton, Troy C.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,025
+2,500 vol $0.81 each |
36,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-04 Tx date 2015-06-02 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Patton, Troy C.
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,542
+8,500 vol $0.65 each |
33,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-04 Tx date 2015-06-02 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Robert L. Lentz Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,005
+1,500 vol $0.67 each |
11,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-04 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Lentz, Robert Leonard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Robert L. Lentz Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,061
+9,500 vol $0.64 each |
9,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-02 Tx date 2015-05-29 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Mark, Elliot J.
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,644
+6,000 vol $0.61 each |
29,154 | |
Filed 2015-05-27 Tx date 2015-05-22 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$8,630
+10,000 vol $0.86 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2015-05-27 Tx date 2014-04-16 |
$NPS
Northern Power Systems Corp. (formerly Mira III Acquisition Corp.) |
Leimkuhler, William Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|