Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-04-14 19:55 Tx date 2022-04-06 |
$OG
Oragin Foods Inc. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
625,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:49 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
525,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:47 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
525,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:46 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
525,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:45 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
625,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:43 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamb, Nelson Garry
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2021-10-20 18:41 Tx date 2021-10-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
1,275,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:22 Tx date 2021-02-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-8,550
-9,500 vol $0.90 each |
30,500 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:22 Tx date 2021-02-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-8,900
-10,000 vol $0.89 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:21 Tx date 2021-02-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-8,700
-10,000 vol $0.87 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:21 Tx date 2021-02-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-8,500
-10,000 vol $0.85 each |
60,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:21 Tx date 2021-02-10 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-17,000
-20,000 vol $0.85 each |
70,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-12 20:20 Tx date 2021-02-10 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-8,300
-10,000 vol $0.83 each |
90,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-08 22:35 Tx date 2021-02-05 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
-100,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-08 22:34 Tx date 2021-02-05 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
51 - Exercise of options
|
$36,000
+100,000 vol $0.36 each |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-08 22:33 Tx date 2021-02-04 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-45,500
-50,000 vol $0.91 each |
0 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:36 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+125,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:35 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:33 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+125,000 vol |
475,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:32 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+125,000 vol |
475,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:30 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+125,000 vol |
1,125,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:28 Tx date 2021-01-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamb, Nelson Garry
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2021-02-02 23:28 Tx date 2019-12-02 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamb, Nelson Garry
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-09-16 12:20 Tx date 2019-05-01 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-16 12:19 Tx date 2019-04-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-09-16 12:18 Tx date 2019-04-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lovsin, Micheal
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
50,000 | ||
Filed 2017-11-20 Tx date 2017-11-17 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,995
+9,500 vol $0.21 each |
1,818,250 | |
Filed 2017-11-20 Tx date 2017-11-17 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$13,395
+57,000 vol $0.235 each |
1,808,750 | |
Filed 2017-10-18 Tx date 2017-09-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
+30,000 vol |
||
Filed 2017-10-18 Tx date 2017-10-16 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$26,400
+132,000 vol $0.20 each |
1,751,750 | |
Filed 2017-10-18 Tx date 2017-10-16 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,510
+18,000 vol $0.195 each |
1,619,750 | |
Filed 2017-10-18 Tx date 2017-09-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-30,000 vol |
292,000 | |
Filed 2017-10-06 Tx date 2017-09-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
+30,000 vol |
352,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+350,000 vol |
350,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Balanovskaya, Olga
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+100,000 vol |
100,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
CLIFFORD, EVAN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
CLIFFORD, EVAN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-11-16 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+350,000 vol |
350,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-12-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Szaszkiewicz, Antonina
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Szaszkiewicz, Antonina
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2016-10-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-11 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-03 Tx date 2017-07-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+175,000 vol |
175,000 | |
Filed 2017-07-24 Tx date 2017-07-24 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamacraft, Scott Emmett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-3,000,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-07-14 Tx date 2017-07-11 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
800,000 | ||
Filed 2017-07-14 Tx date 2017-07-11 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Williams, Kevin Sean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
800,000 | ||
Filed 2017-06-22 Tx date 2017-06-22 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-25,000 vol |
322,000 | |
Filed 2017-06-06 Tx date 2017-05-29 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-250,000 vol |
347,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-17 Tx date 2017-05-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
-108,000 vol |
597,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-17 Tx date 2017-05-15 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
$37,800
+108,000 vol $0.35 each |
1,601,750 | |
Filed 2017-04-26 Tx date 2017-03-17 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,350
+4,500 vol $0.30 each |
1,493,750 | |
Filed 2017-04-26 Tx date 2017-03-17 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,622
+5,500 vol $0.295 each |
1,489,250 | |
Filed 2017-03-03 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$100,000
+400,000 vol $0.25 each |
1,483,750 | |
Filed 2017-03-03 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+400,000 vol |
705,000 | |
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamacraft, Scott Emmett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+3,000,000 vol |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamacraft, Scott Emmett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamacraft, Scott Emmett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$750,000
+3,000,000 vol $0.25 each |
3,000,000 | |
Filed 2017-03-02 Tx date 2017-02-28 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Lamacraft, Scott Emmett
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-02-10 Tx date 2017-02-08 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,475
+5,000 vol $0.295 each |
1,083,750 | |
Filed 2017-02-10 Tx date 2017-02-08 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,505
+5,000 vol $0.301 each |
1,078,750 | |
Filed 2017-01-24 Tx date 2017-01-24 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,525
+5,000 vol $0.305 each |
1,073,750 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$15,000
+50,000 vol $0.30 each |
1,068,750 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Szaszkiewicz, Antonina
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$5,000
+16,667 vol $0.30 each |
16,667 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-12 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Szaszkiewicz, Antonina
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$15,000
+50,000 vol $0.30 each |
50,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-11-16 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Stein, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$15,000
+50,000 vol $0.30 each |
8,150,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
CLIFFORD, EVAN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$15,000
+50,000 vol $0.30 each |
550,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-30 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$15,000
+50,000 vol $0.30 each |
250,000 | |
Filed 2016-12-23 Tx date 2016-12-23 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,849
+10,000 vol $0.285 each |
1,018,750 | |
Filed 2016-12-22 Tx date 2016-12-21 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,100
+10,000 vol $0.31 each |
998,750 | |
Filed 2016-12-22 Tx date 2016-12-21 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,103
+10,000 vol $0.3103 each |
1,008,750 | |
Filed 2016-11-09 Tx date 2016-11-09 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$12,270
+50,000 vol $0.2454 each |
988,750 | |
Filed 2016-11-01 Tx date 2016-10-31 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Villazor, Ken
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
200,000 | ||
Filed 2016-11-01 Tx date 2016-11-01 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,563
+10,000 vol $0.3563 each |
938,750 | |
Filed 2016-11-01 Tx date 2016-11-01 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,000
+10,000 vol $0.30 each |
928,750 | |
Filed 2016-10-28 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
305,000 | ||
Filed 2016-10-28 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-10-28 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
918,750 | ||
Filed 2016-10-28 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
Crupi, Christopher
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Christopher Crupi Consulting Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
400,000 | ||
Filed 2016-10-26 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
CLIFFORD, EVAN
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
500,000 | ||
Filed 2016-10-25 Tx date 2016-10-18 |
$OG
Organic Garage Ltd. |
LURIE, MATT
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
8,100,000 |