Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Brown, David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-03-01 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Brown, David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-03-01 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Kosziwka, Sandra
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Kosziwka, Sandra
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-03-01 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Natarajan, Rajamohan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Natarajan, Rajamohan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-02-15 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Travaglini, John Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Travaglini, John Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 | |
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-05-29 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Wood, Paul Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Kappa Advisors Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-06-28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$PN
Platform 9 Capital Corp. |
Wood, Paul Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Kappa Advisors Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+150,000 vol |
150,000 |