Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-01-20 Tx date 2014-04-25 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: YB Financial Holdings Inc. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-5,700 vol |
276,800 | |
Filed 2016-01-20 Tx date 2014-04-25 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-7,092 vol |
397,518 | |
Filed 2016-01-20 Tx date 2014-05-01 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-1,000 vol |
396,518 | |
Filed 2016-01-20 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,337,357 vol |
||
Filed 2016-01-20 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,335,849 vol |
1,835,847 | |
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-280,080 vol |
||
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-277,067 vol |
73,033 | |
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2016-01-15 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
99 - Correction of information
|
-57,502 vol |
437,412 | |
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2016-01-15 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
99 - Correction of information
|
+57,502 vol |
130,535 | |
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,259,657 vol |
||
Filed 2016-01-15 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,329,657 vol |
494,914 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Maser, Jeffrey Evan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-23 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Maser, Jeffrey Evan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
$150,000
+3,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
4,525,833 | |
Filed 2016-01-04 Tx date 2015-12-23 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Maser, Jeffrey Evan
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+910,500 vol |
910,500 | |
Filed 2015-12-14 Tx date 2015-12-11 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+62,500 vol |
310,477 | |
Filed 2015-12-14 Tx date 2015-12-11 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$25,000
+250,000 vol $0.10 each |
1,141,899 | |
Filed 2015-12-14 Tx date 2015-12-11 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-25,000
-250,000 vol $0.10 each |
891,899 | |
Filed 2015-11-30 Tx date 2015-10-20 |
$QIA
The Tinley Beverage Company Inc. (formerly Quia Resources Inc.) |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-19,356.06
-1,613,005 vol $0.012 each |
221,334 | |
Filed 2015-10-13 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-$11,200 vol |
||
Filed 2015-10-13 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-$14,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-07 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,220,811 vol |
305,203 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-07 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-991,909 vol |
247,977 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-07 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-07 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,826,270 vol |
956,568 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-07 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,567,594 vol |
891,899 | |
Filed 2015-10-08 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Posner, David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,080,000 vol |
1,520,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-$11,200 vol |
$2,800 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,337,357 vol |
1,834,339 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: YB Financial Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-45,200 vol |
11,300 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-220,000 vol |
55,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-32,369 vol |
8,092 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: YB Financial Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-22,800 vol |
5,700 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Roodenburg, Anthony Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-120,000 vol |
30,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Lin, Paul
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+384,391 vol |
||
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Lin, Paul
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-307,513 vol |
76,878 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Maser, Jeffrey Evan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
7,629,167 | ||
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Maser, Jeffrey Evan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,103,334 vol |
1,525,833 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,259,657 vol |
564,914 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Daphne Hoffenberg-Szweras (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-204,520 vol |
51,130 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-280,080 vol |
70,020 | |
Filed 2015-10-07 Tx date 2015-10-06 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-103,404 vol |
25,850 | |
Filed 2015-10-02 Tx date 2015-09-30 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Banks, Yannis
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$96,780
+8,065,028 vol $0.012 each |
9,171,696 | |
Filed 2015-10-02 Tx date 2015-09-30 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Szweras, Adam Kelley
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$16,035
+1,336,265 vol $0.012 each |
2,824,571 | |
Filed 2015-10-02 Tx date 2015-10-02 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Posner, David
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
7,600,000 | ||
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$65,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Control or Direction)
|
Convertible Debentures
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
-$80,000 vol |
$0 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$27,557
+2,296,430 vol $0.012 each |
4,459,493 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$48,391
+1,613,063 vol $0.03 each |
2,163,063 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$33,570
+2,797,530 vol $0.012 each |
4,782,838 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2013-12-16 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
$59,559
+1,985,308 vol $0.03 each |
1,985,308 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+806,531 vol |
1,239,886 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Dent, Roger
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Susan Lambie (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+992,654 vol |
1,526,014 | |
Filed 2015-08-19 Tx date 2015-08-14 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Yamana Gold Inc.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$-7,000
-1,400,000 vol $0.005 each |
0 | |
Filed 2015-08-19 Tx date 2014-06-09 |
$QIA
Quia Resources Inc. |
Yamana Gold Inc.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-12,600,000 vol |
1,400,000 |