Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2021-01-12 21:56 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+140,000 vol |
140,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-12 21:54 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-12 21:52 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$12,350
+47,500 vol $0.26 each |
290,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-12 21:51 Tx date 2020-10-26 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$37,050
+142,500 vol $0.26 each |
242,500 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 18:39 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Gaunt, Breton
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+5,000 vol |
5,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 18:39 Tx date 2020-10-14 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Gaunt, Breton
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-08 18:38 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+140,000 vol |
140,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 18:37 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-08 18:36 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+340,000 vol |
340,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 18:35 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-08 18:29 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
+375,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 17:54 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units (RSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-01-08 17:08 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Gaunt, Breton
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+5,000 vol |
20,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 17:06 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+41,250 vol |
245,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 17:04 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+81,250 vol |
425,000 | |
Filed 2021-01-08 16:59 Tx date 2021-01-06 |
$RMMI
Discover Wellness Solutions Inc. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+130,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-31 14:53 Tx date 2020-12-16 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
SynerGenetics Bioscience Inc.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
45 - Compensation for property
|
+14,250,000 vol |
14,250,000 | |
Filed 2020-12-31 14:50 Tx date 2020-12-16 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
SynerGenetics Bioscience Inc.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-12-04 12:29 Tx date 2020-12-01 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,000 vol |
465,000 | |
Filed 2020-11-06 16:27 Tx date 2020-07-06 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Bedard-Brunet, Joey
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
97 - Other
|
-8,457,778 vol |
900 | |
Filed 2020-11-06 16:14 Tx date 2020-07-06 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Bedard-Brunet, Joey
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
99 - Correction of information
|
-8,457,778 vol |
||
Filed 2020-11-06 14:38 Tx date 2020-11-02 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,000 vol |
420,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-29 22:48 Tx date 2020-10-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$96,200
+370,000 vol $0.26 each |
470,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-29 21:08 Tx date 2020-10-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Gaunt, Breton
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+15,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2020-10-29 21:07 Tx date 2020-10-14 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Gaunt, Breton
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-10-29 21:05 Tx date 2020-10-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+123,750 vol |
203,750 | |
Filed 2020-10-29 21:02 Tx date 2020-10-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+243,750 vol |
343,750 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 19:17 Tx date 2020-10-01 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,000 vol |
375,000 | |
Filed 2020-09-11 15:20 Tx date 2020-09-09 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,000 vol |
330,000 | |
Filed 2020-09-02 09:37 Tx date 2020-08-28 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,000 vol |
285,000 | |
Filed 2020-08-31 17:02 Tx date 2020-08-28 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$14,175
+63,000 vol $0.225 each |
107,334 | |
Filed 2020-07-29 14:06 Tx date 2020-07-29 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-11,404
-40,000 vol $0.2851 each |
44,334 | |
Filed 2020-07-23 22:54 Tx date 2020-07-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-3,025
-11,000 vol $0.275 each |
84,334 | |
Filed 2020-07-22 12:06 Tx date 2020-07-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Canaccord - Eugene Chen (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,062.50
-7,500 vol $0.275 each |
22,500 | |
Filed 2020-07-16 18:37 Tx date 2020-07-14 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+90,000 vol |
240,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-16 18:31 Tx date 2020-07-13 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Watfield Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+225,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2020-07-16 18:30 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Watfield Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-07-16 18:26 Tx date 2020-07-13 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+187,500 vol |
207,500 | |
Filed 2020-07-09 16:38 Tx date 2020-07-06 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Bedard-Brunet, Joey
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$1,903,000
+8,457,778 vol $0.225 each |
8,458,678 | |
Filed 2020-07-08 17:10 Tx date 2020-07-08 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Bedard-Brunet, Joey
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
900 | ||
Filed 2019-10-05 00:01 Tx date 2019-09-30 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$400.00
+1,000 vol $0.40 each |
3,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-26 16:02 Tx date 2019-09-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$68.00
+100 vol $0.68 each |
4,100 | |
Filed 2019-09-25 16:44 Tx date 2019-09-25 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$340.00
+500 vol $0.68 each |
4,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-25 16:43 Tx date 2019-09-25 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$325.00
+500 vol $0.65 each |
3,500 | |
Filed 2019-09-25 16:40 Tx date 2019-09-25 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$340.00
+500 vol $0.68 each |
3,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-25 13:53 Tx date 2019-09-25 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$345.00
+500 vol $0.69 each |
2,500 | |
Filed 2019-09-19 10:34 Tx date 2019-09-18 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$345.00
+500 vol $0.69 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-06 13:26 Tx date 2019-09-06 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$345.00
+500 vol $0.69 each |
1,500 | |
Filed 2019-09-06 13:20 Tx date 2019-09-05 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$305.00
+500 vol $0.61 each |
1,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-05 15:45 Tx date 2019-09-05 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$305.00
+500 vol $0.61 each |
||
Filed 2019-09-05 15:52 Tx date 2019-09-04 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$350.00
+500 vol $0.70 each |
500 | |
Filed 2019-09-05 15:52 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Personally Held RRSP Account (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-09-05 15:45 Tx date 2019-09-05 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$305.00
+500 vol $0.61 each |
8,000 | |
Filed 2019-09-03 18:17 Tx date 2019-08-30 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$350.00
+500 vol $0.70 each |
7,500 | |
Filed 2019-09-03 18:16 Tx date 2019-08-30 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,500
+5,000 vol $0.70 each |
7,000 | |
Filed 2018-11-28 Tx date 2018-11-26 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chakraborty, Saptarshi
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+25,000 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2018-11-28 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chakraborty, Saptarshi
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-10-10 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Canaccord - Eugene Chen (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
30,000 | ||
Filed 2018-10-10 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
150,000 | ||
Filed 2018-10-10 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Eugene Chen Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-10-10 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Canaccord - Eugene Chen (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Staniloff, Marc Leslie
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Cheung, Peter
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
95,334 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Deborah Guebert RRSP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-24 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Chen, Eugene
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$5,000
+2,000 vol $2.50 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Connors, Earl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Fairfield, John Anthony (Tony)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Staniloff, Marc Leslie
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$RMMI
RMMI Corp. |
Guebert, David Dean
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Deborah Guebert RRSP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|