Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2021-11-26 17:09 Tx date 2021-10-28 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Mitoulas, Vassilios
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
340,000 | ||
Filed 2021-11-26 17:07 Tx date 2021-10-28 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Mitoulas, Vassilios
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,179,167 | ||
Filed 2021-11-25 23:44 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Garcea, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,119,166 | ||
Filed 2021-11-22 11:34 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Garcea, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-11-01 13:18 Tx date 2021-10-28 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Mitoulas, Vassilios
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-11-23 10:45 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Duncan, Murray Reginald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
340,000 | ||
Filed 2021-11-23 10:45 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Duncan, Murray Reginald
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,312,517 | ||
Filed 2021-11-22 11:37 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Garcea, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
340,000 | ||
Filed 2021-11-22 11:34 Tx date 2021-11-19 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Garcea, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,191,166 | ||
Filed 2021-11-01 13:18 Tx date 2021-10-28 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Mitoulas, Vassilios
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
866,667 | ||
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-03-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Hutchison, Robin Bruce
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+275,000 vol |
275,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-02-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Hutchison, Robin Bruce
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-03-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Hutchison, John Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+105,000 vol |
105,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-02-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Hutchison, John Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-03-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Erickson, Ronald Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+275,000 vol |
275,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-02-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
Erickson, Ronald Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-03-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
DALLING, JUDI
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+105,000 vol |
105,000 | |
Filed 2018-03-16 Tx date 2018-02-15 |
$RMSP
RMR Science Technologies Inc. |
DALLING, JUDI
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|