Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-21 |
$THH
Flower One Holdings Inc. (formerly Theia Resources Ltd.) |
Amit, Varma
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
525,000 | ||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-21 |
$THH
Flower One Holdings Inc. (formerly Theia Resources Ltd.) |
Miachika, Geoffrey Paul
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
250,000 | ||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-21 |
$THH
Flower One Holdings Inc. (formerly Theia Resources Ltd.) |
Miachika, Geoffrey Paul
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,000 | ||
Filed 2018-09-24 Tx date 2018-09-21 |
$THH
Flower One Holdings Inc. (formerly Theia Resources Ltd.) |
Amit, Varma
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,208,390 | ||
Filed 2017-05-18 Tx date 2017-05-16 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-9,000
-100,000 vol $0.09 each |
1,548,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-18 Tx date 2017-05-16 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$-99,000
-1,100,000 vol $0.09 each |
1,648,000 | |
Filed 2017-05-18 Tx date 2014-06-03 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Brigitte McDonald (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
350,000 | ||
Filed 2017-05-18 Tx date 2014-06-03 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Keith Sr. MacMillan (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
500,000 | ||
Filed 2017-05-18 Tx date 2014-06-03 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Holder: Samantha McDonald (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
350,000 | ||
Filed 2016-04-25 Tx date 2016-04-20 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
McDonald, Susan Ellen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,000
+50,000 vol $0.10 each |
2,748,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-12 |
$THH
Theia Resources Ltd. |
Youngman, Bruce A.
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,200
+20,000 vol $0.11 each |
320,000 |