Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2017-02-10 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Saxon, Vick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
357,373 | ||
Filed 2017-02-08 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Gill, Sanjib Singh
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Gurmail Gill (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
357,373 | ||
Filed 2017-02-08 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Mottahed, Shahin (Sonny)
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Black Spruce Merchant Capital Corp. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
76,580 | ||
Filed 2017-02-08 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Mottahed, Shahin (Sonny)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
375,373 | ||
Filed 2017-02-08 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Gill, Sanjib Singh
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Bailey, Douglas George
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
996,661 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Braun, Kevin Edward
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
102,107 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Derkat, David Anthony
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
102,107 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Muller, Frank Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
740,272 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Muller, Frank Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Debbie Muller (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
510,533 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Muller, Frank Peter
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Frank Resource Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
331,846 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Smith, Stanley Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
178,686 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Sundstrom, Devin Kent
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
102,107 | ||
Filed 2017-02-03 Tx date 2017-01-31 |
$VCR
Razor Energy Corp. |
Sych, Stephen George
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
102,107 | ||
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2011-10-03 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2011-10-03 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2011-10-03 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
250,000 | ||
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2011-10-31 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
15 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus
|
$7,500
+37,500 vol $0.20 each |
287,500 | |
Filed 2016-04-01 Tx date 2011-10-03 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
287,500 | ||
Filed 2016-04-01 Tx date 2011-10-03 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-03-31 Tx date 2014-11-17 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$550.00
+11,000 vol $0.05 each |
137,000 | |
Filed 2016-03-31 Tx date 2014-11-17 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Levitt, Darryl
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$500.00
+10,000 vol $0.05 each |
||
Filed 2015-08-07 Tx date 2010-02-04 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Nell, Mike
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-125,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-08-07 Tx date 2014-02-04 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Nell, Mike
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-125,000 vol |
125,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-21 Tx date 2011-10-31 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Baptist, Keith
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10,000
+50,000 vol $0.20 each |
300,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2010-02-04 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Nell, Mike
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-125,000 vol |
125,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2014-02-04 |
$VCR
Vector Resources Inc. |
Molyneux, Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
38 - Redemption, retraction, cancellation, repurchase
|
-125,000 vol |
125,000 |