Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2022-10-11 15:39 Tx date 2022-10-06 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
+555,600 vol |
555,600 | |
Filed 2022-10-11 15:25 Tx date 2010-06-01 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-10-11 15:08 Tx date 2022-10-06 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$200,016
+555,600 vol $0.36 each |
39,017,267 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 19:02 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Ingram, Samuel
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
225,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 19:00 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Masse, Luc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 18:59 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Masse, Luc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+230,854 vol |
230,854 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 18:59 Tx date 2019-04-29 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Masse, Luc
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 18:56 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+900,000 vol |
925,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 18:55 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+412,376 vol |
412,376 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 18:54 Tx date 2010-06-01 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 18:54 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+38,461,667 vol |
38,461,667 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 18:52 Tx date 2010-06-01 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
McDougall, Ian Alexander
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 17:33 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Lynch, Glen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,200,000 vol |
1,200,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 17:32 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Singhvi, Abhinav
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+600,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 17:30 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Silverman, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+200,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 17:27 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Walker, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-04 13:26 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Lynch, Glen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 13:26 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Lynch, Glen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 13:24 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Silverman, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 13:24 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Silverman, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 13:22 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Silverman, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 13:22 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Silverman, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:38 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Walker, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:37 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Walker, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:37 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Walker, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:37 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Walker, Robert
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
232,461 | ||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:17 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Singhvi, Abhinav
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:17 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Singhvi, Abhinav
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Preferred Shares Class A Preferred Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:17 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Singhvi, Abhinav
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-04 11:12 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Singhvi, Abhinav
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
307,692 | ||
Filed 2022-01-03 15:15 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Lynch, Glen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-01-03 15:15 Tx date 2021-12-22 |
$VOL
Volatus Aerospace Corp. (formerly, Partner Jet Corp.) |
Lynch, Glen
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
38,461,667 | ||
Filed 2017-01-11 Tx date 2017-01-10 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Iverson, Michael Alexander
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
47 - Acquisition or disposition by gift
|
-72,852 vol |
1,652,448 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2013-03-04 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-10,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2013-05-06 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Red Fern Consulting Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-234,000 vol |
26,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2017-01-05 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
53 - Grant of warrants
|
$8,375
+33,500 vol $0.25 each |
33,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2012-05-19 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-10,000 vol |
10,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2015-02-03 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-150,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2013-05-06 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Red Fern Consulting Ltd (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-234,000 vol |
26,000 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2017-01-05 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$10,050
+67,000 vol $0.15 each |
92,500 | |
Filed 2017-01-10 Tx date 2013-05-06 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-126,000 vol |
14,000 | |
Filed 2016-05-06 Tx date 2016-05-02 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,190
+17,000 vol $0.07 each |
151,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-19 Tx date 2015-10-09 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Richards, Jonathan Rene
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
-5,500 vol |
134,500 | |
Filed 2015-09-02 Tx date 2015-08-17 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Iverson, Michael Alexander
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,200
+40,000 vol $0.055 each |
1,725,300 | |
Filed 2015-06-22 Tx date 2015-05-06 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Iverson, Michael Alexander
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$900.00
+9,000 vol $0.10 each |
1,685,300 | |
Filed 2015-06-22 Tx date 2015-04-30 |
$VOL
Volcanic Metals Corp. |
Iverson, Michael Alexander
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100.00
+1,000 vol $0.10 each |
1,676,300 |