Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-05-24 17:01 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Zaffis, Thomas
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
287,430 | ||
Filed 2024-05-24 17:01 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Zaffis, Thomas
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
544,627 | ||
Filed 2024-05-16 10:59 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Beutel, David Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
57,486 | ||
Filed 2024-05-16 10:58 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Beutel, David Michael
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Belweather Capital Partners Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
11,592,908 | ||
Filed 2024-05-10 16:25 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Tornikoski, Jaana Marja-Liisa
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
57,486 | ||
Filed 2024-05-10 16:24 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Tornikoski, Jaana Marja-Liisa
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
218,540 | ||
Filed 2024-05-06 16:36 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Bell, David Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
71,858 | ||
Filed 2024-05-06 16:24 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Bell, David Gregory
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
54,348 | ||
Filed 2024-05-01 21:31 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Stubos, Dimitris
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+1,098,887 vol |
2,098,887 | |
Filed 2024-05-01 21:28 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Anderson, Ian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+108,696 vol |
708,696 | |
Filed 2024-05-01 21:24 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Beutel, Eric Marshall
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Debric Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+342,391 vol |
10,797,584 | |
Filed 2024-05-01 21:23 Tx date 2024-04-26 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Beutel, Eric Marshall
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Debric Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
22 - Acquisition or disposition pursuant to a take-over bid, merger or acquisition
|
+10,455,193 vol |
10,455,193 | |
Filed 2024-05-01 21:21 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
THS Maple Holdings Ltd. (formerly Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc.) |
Beutel, Eric Marshall
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Debric Holdings Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 11:03 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Gallander, Benjamin
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,000
+40,000 vol $0.10 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 11:02 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Gallander, Benjamin
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 11:01 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
White, William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,000
+40,000 vol $0.10 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 11:00 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
White, William
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:59 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
White, Andrew James
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,000
+40,000 vol $0.10 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:59 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
White, Andrew James
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:57 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Korol, Mark
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$4,000
+40,000 vol $0.10 each |
40,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:57 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Korol, Mark
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:55 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Sbrolla, James
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$25,500
+255,000 vol $0.10 each |
255,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:54 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Sbrolla, James
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:50 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Clarke, Lyle Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$8,500
+85,000 vol $0.10 each |
85,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:49 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Clarke, Lyle Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:48 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Macri, Enzo
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$8,500
+85,000 vol $0.10 each |
85,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:47 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Macri, Enzo
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:46 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Anderson, Ian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,000
+90,000 vol $0.10 each |
90,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:45 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Anderson, Ian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:41 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Nicholson, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$8,500
+85,000 vol $0.10 each |
85,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:40 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Nicholson, John
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:39 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Stubos, Dimitris
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,500
+95,000 vol $0.10 each |
95,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:38 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Stubos, Dimitris
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-07-05 10:36 Tx date 2021-07-02 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Beutel, Eric Marshall
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$9,500
+95,000 vol $0.10 each |
95,000 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 10:35 Tx date 2021-06-08 |
$YAYP
Toronto Cleantech Capital Inc. |
Beutel, Eric Marshall
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|